Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3293127

EP3293127 - FOLDABLE CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.08.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.02.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shanghai Hongyan Returnable Transit Packagings Co., Ltd.
Room 1105, No. 20 Building
No. 487 Tianlin Rd.
Xuhui District
Shanghai 200233 / CN
[2018/11]
Inventor(s)01 / JIAN, Yuanli
c/o Shanghai Hongyan
Returnable Transit Packages Co., Ltd.
Room 1105, No. 20 Building,NO. 487 TianLin RD
Xuhui District
Shanghai 200233 / CN
 [2018/11]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2018/11]
Application number, filing date16789332.005.05.2016
[2018/11]
WO2016CN81179
Priority number, dateCN20151022949707.05.2015         Original published format: CN201510229497
[2018/11]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016177338
Date:10.11.2016
Language:ZH
[2016/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3293127
Date:14.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN10.11.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.2018
ClassificationInternational:B65D19/18, // B65D19/06
[2018/45]
Former International [2018/11]B65D88/52, B65D6/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/11]
TitleGerman:FALTBARER BEHÄLTER[2018/11]
English:FOLDABLE CONTAINER[2018/11]
French:RÉCIPIENT PLIABLE[2018/11]
Entry into regional phase07.12.2017Translation filed 
07.12.2017National basic fee paid 
07.12.2017Search fee paid 
07.12.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/11]
07.12.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2500291  (UTZ GEORG HOLDING AG [CH]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0018] * * figures 1-6 * [I] 6,9;
 [X]DE102009005212  (SCHOELLER ARCA SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7,8,10 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0056] * * figures 2-11 *;
 [A]CN103693264  (SHANGHAI HONGYAN LOGISTICS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-17 *
International search[PX]CN104944012  (SHANGHAI HONGYAN RETURNABLE TRANSIT PACKAGINGS CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * , claims 1-10 *;
 [XY]CN102574607  (PACK NLOG GMBH) [X] 1 * , description, paragraphs [0035]-[0042], and figures 1-4, description, paragraphs [0035]-[0042], and figures 1-4 * [Y] 8;
 [Y]CN104554980  (SHANGHAI HONGYAN LOGISTICS TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 8 * , description, paragraph [0068], and figures 19-20 *;
 [A]US3982650  (ICHIHARA SHIGEO) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN1402682  (KYORAKU CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * , the whole document *