EP3368438 - EXTRUSION BLOW MOULDED CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alpla-Werke Alwin Lehner GMBH & Co.KG Allmendstrasse 81 6971 Hard / AT | [2023/50] |
Former [2018/36] | For all designated states Alpla-Werke Alwin Lehner GMBH & Co.KG Allmendstrasse 6971 Hard / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNTERLECHNER, Oliver Brielgasse 28a 6900 Bregenz / AT | 02 /
NIGL, Christoph Wuhrweg 13 6922 Wolfurt / AT | [2018/36] | Representative(s) | Swisspat Riederer Hasler Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | [2023/51] |
Former [2018/36] | Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | Application number, filing date | 16790920.9 | 26.10.2016 | [2018/36] | WO2016EP75824 | Priority number, date | CH20150001569 | 27.10.2015 Original published format: CH 15692015 | [2018/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017072185 | Date: | 04.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3368438 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3368438 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/00, B65D1/26 | [2018/36] | CPC: |
B65D35/24 (EP,US);
B65D2205/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXTRUSIONSBLASGEFORMTER BEHÄLTER | [2018/36] | English: | EXTRUSION BLOW MOULDED CONTAINER | [2018/36] | French: | CONTENANT FABRIQUÉ PAR MOULAGE PAR EXTRUDO-GONFLAGE | [2018/36] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/36] | 24.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | HR | 20.12.2023 | |
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | HR | 20.12.2023 | |
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HR | 20.12.2023 | |
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5013517 (ROBBINS III EDWARD S [US]); | [X]FR2794428 (M R IND [FR]); | [Y]US2010172600 (SHERRILL AMY WHITEMAN [US], et al); | [A]DE102010027847 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]); | [A]CN104736446 (NIHON YAMAMURA GLASS CO LTD) | Examination | US5013517 | US2010172600 | EP2910486 |