blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3294125

EP3294125 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING CREATININE AND ALBUMIN TO CREATININE RATIO [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.07.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.08.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.09.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.02.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Indian Institute Of Science
Sir C V Raman Avenue
Bangalore 560012 / IN
[2018/12]
Inventor(s)01 / KUMAR, Vinay
Centre For Nanoscience and Engineering
Indian Institute of Science
Sir C V Raman Avenue
Bangalore 560012 / IN
02 / BHAT, Navakanta
Centre For Nanoscience and Engineering
Indian Institute of Science
Sir C V Raman Avenue
Bangalore 560012 / IN
03 / KASHYAP DHANVANTARI MADHURESH, Nikhila
Centre For Nanoscience and Engineering
Indian Institute of Science
Sir C V Raman Avenue
Bangalore 560012 / IN
 [2018/12]
Representative(s)Gassner, Birgitta, et al
REDL Life Science Patent Attorneys
Donau-City-Straße 11
1220 Wien / AT
[2018/12]
Application number, filing date16792263.222.01.2016
[2018/12]
WO2016IB50311
Priority number, dateIN2015CHE241212.05.2015         Original published format: IN 2412CH2015
[2018/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2016181229
Date:17.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3294125
Date:21.03.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3294125
Date:08.09.2021
Language:EN
[2021/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.11.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.10.2018
ClassificationIPC:A61B5/05, C07K14/76, G01N27/327, G01N27/447, G01N33/48, G01N33/493
[2018/12]
CPC:
C07K14/76 (EP); G01N27/3277 (US); A61B10/007 (EP);
A61B5/14507 (EP,US); A61B5/14546 (EP,US); A61B5/1468 (EP,US);
A61B5/207 (EP); G01N27/327 (EP,US); G01N27/48 (US);
G01N33/493 (EP,US); G01N33/5438 (EP,US); G01N33/68 (US);
G01N33/70 (US); G01N2333/76 (US); G01N2333/765 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/12]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS VON KREATININ UND ALBUMIN-KREATININ-VERHÄLTNIS[2018/12]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETECTING CREATININE AND ALBUMIN TO CREATININE RATIO[2018/12]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE CRÉATININE ET DE RAPPORT ALBUMINE/CRÉATININE[2018/12]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2017National basic fee paid 
04.12.2017Search fee paid 
04.12.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.02.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/12]
04.12.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.09.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2020Fee for grant paid
17.12.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.12.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)09.06.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
30.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.202005   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2020
31.01.202106   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2021
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.01.2016
AL08.09.2021
AT08.09.2021
CY08.09.2021
CZ08.09.2021
DK08.09.2021
EE08.09.2021
ES08.09.2021
FI08.09.2021
HR08.09.2021
IT08.09.2021
LT08.09.2021
LV08.09.2021
MC08.09.2021
MK08.09.2021
NL08.09.2021
PL08.09.2021
RO08.09.2021
RS08.09.2021
SI08.09.2021
SK08.09.2021
SM08.09.2021
BG08.12.2021
NO08.12.2021
GR09.12.2021
IS08.01.2022
PT10.01.2022
IE22.01.2022
LU22.01.2022
BE31.01.2022
CH31.01.2022
LI31.01.2022
[2024/22]
Former [2024/20]HU22.01.2016
AL08.09.2021
AT08.09.2021
CY08.09.2021
CZ08.09.2021
DK08.09.2021
EE08.09.2021
ES08.09.2021
FI08.09.2021
HR08.09.2021
IT08.09.2021
LT08.09.2021
LV08.09.2021
MC08.09.2021
NL08.09.2021
PL08.09.2021
RO08.09.2021
RS08.09.2021
SI08.09.2021
SK08.09.2021
SM08.09.2021
BG08.12.2021
NO08.12.2021
GR09.12.2021
IS08.01.2022
PT10.01.2022
IE22.01.2022
LU22.01.2022
BE31.01.2022
CH31.01.2022
LI31.01.2022
Former [2024/18]HU22.01.2016
AL08.09.2021
AT08.09.2021
CZ08.09.2021
DK08.09.2021
EE08.09.2021
ES08.09.2021
FI08.09.2021
HR08.09.2021
IT08.09.2021
LT08.09.2021
LV08.09.2021
MC08.09.2021
NL08.09.2021
PL08.09.2021
RO08.09.2021
RS08.09.2021
SI08.09.2021
SK08.09.2021
SM08.09.2021
BG08.12.2021
NO08.12.2021
GR09.12.2021
IS08.01.2022
PT10.01.2022
IE22.01.2022
LU22.01.2022
BE31.01.2022
CH31.01.2022
LI31.01.2022
Former [2023/10]AL08.09.2021
AT08.09.2021
CZ08.09.2021
DK08.09.2021
EE08.09.2021
ES08.09.2021
FI08.09.2021
HR08.09.2021
IT08.09.2021
LT08.09.2021
LV08.09.2021
MC08.09.2021
NL08.09.2021
PL08.09.2021
RO08.09.2021
RS08.09.2021
SI08.09.2021
SK08.09.2021
SM08.09.2021
BG08.12.2021
NO08.12.2021
GR09.12.2021
IS08.01.2022
PT10.01.2022
IE22.01.2022
LU22.01.2022
BE31.01.2022
CH31.01.2022
LI31.01.2022
Former [2023/09]AL08.09.2021
AT08.09.2021
CZ08.09.2021
DK08.09.2021
EE08.09.2021
ES08.09.2021
FI08.09.2021
HR08.09.2021
LT08.09.2021
LV08.09.2021
MC08.09.2021
NL08.09.2021
PL08.09.2021
RO08.09.2021
RS08.09.2021
SI08.09.2021
SK08.09.2021
SM08.09.2021
BG08.12.2021
NO08.12.2021
GR09.12.2021
IS08.01.2022
PT10.01.2022
IE22.01.2022
LU22.01.2022
BE31.01.2022
CH31.01.2022
LI31.01.2022
Former [2023/03]AL08.09.2021
AT08.09.2021
CZ08.09.2021
DK08.09.2021
EE08.09.2021
ES08.09.2021
FI08.09.2021
HR08.09.2021
LT08.09.2021
LV08.09.2021
MC08.09.2021
NL08.09.2021
PL08.09.2021
RO08.09.2021
RS08.09.2021
SI08.09.2021
SK08.09.2021
SM08.09.2021
BG08.12.2021
NO08.12.2021
GR09.12.2021
IS08.01.2022
PT10.01.2022
LU22.01.2022
BE31.01.2022
CH31.01.2022
LI31.01.2022
Former [2023/01]AL08.09.2021
AT08.09.2021
CZ08.09.2021
DK08.09.2021
EE08.09.2021
ES08.09.2021
FI08.09.2021
HR08.09.2021
LT08.09.2021
LV08.09.2021
MC08.09.2021
NL08.09.2021
PL08.09.2021
RO08.09.2021
RS08.09.2021
SI08.09.2021
SK08.09.2021
SM08.09.2021
BG08.12.2021
NO08.12.2021
GR09.12.2021
IS08.01.2022
PT10.01.2022
LU22.01.2022
BE31.01.2022
Former [2022/46]AL08.09.2021
AT08.09.2021
CZ08.09.2021
DK08.09.2021
EE08.09.2021
ES08.09.2021
FI08.09.2021
HR08.09.2021
LT08.09.2021
LV08.09.2021
MC08.09.2021
NL08.09.2021
PL08.09.2021
RO08.09.2021
RS08.09.2021
SI08.09.2021
SK08.09.2021
SM08.09.2021
BG08.12.2021
NO08.12.2021
GR09.12.2021
IS08.01.2022
PT10.01.2022
LU22.01.2022
Former [2022/39]AL08.09.2021
AT08.09.2021
CZ08.09.2021
DK08.09.2021
EE08.09.2021
ES08.09.2021
FI08.09.2021
HR08.09.2021
LT08.09.2021
LV08.09.2021
MC08.09.2021
NL08.09.2021
PL08.09.2021
RO08.09.2021
RS08.09.2021
SI08.09.2021
SK08.09.2021
SM08.09.2021
BG08.12.2021
NO08.12.2021
GR09.12.2021
IS08.01.2022
PT10.01.2022
Former [2022/36]AL08.09.2021
AT08.09.2021
CZ08.09.2021
DK08.09.2021
EE08.09.2021
ES08.09.2021
FI08.09.2021
HR08.09.2021
LT08.09.2021
LV08.09.2021
NL08.09.2021
PL08.09.2021
RO08.09.2021
RS08.09.2021
SI08.09.2021
SK08.09.2021
SM08.09.2021
BG08.12.2021
NO08.12.2021
GR09.12.2021
IS08.01.2022
PT10.01.2022
Former [2022/29]AL08.09.2021
AT08.09.2021
CZ08.09.2021
EE08.09.2021
ES08.09.2021
FI08.09.2021
HR08.09.2021
LT08.09.2021
LV08.09.2021
NL08.09.2021
PL08.09.2021
RO08.09.2021
RS08.09.2021
SK08.09.2021
SM08.09.2021
BG08.12.2021
NO08.12.2021
GR09.12.2021
IS08.01.2022
PT10.01.2022
Former [2022/25]AT08.09.2021
CZ08.09.2021
EE08.09.2021
ES08.09.2021
FI08.09.2021
HR08.09.2021
LT08.09.2021
LV08.09.2021
NL08.09.2021
PL08.09.2021
RO08.09.2021
RS08.09.2021
SK08.09.2021
SM08.09.2021
BG08.12.2021
NO08.12.2021
GR09.12.2021
IS08.01.2022
PT10.01.2022
Former [2022/24]AT08.09.2021
CZ08.09.2021
EE08.09.2021
ES08.09.2021
FI08.09.2021
HR08.09.2021
LT08.09.2021
LV08.09.2021
NL08.09.2021
PL08.09.2021
RO08.09.2021
RS08.09.2021
SK08.09.2021
BG08.12.2021
NO08.12.2021
GR09.12.2021
IS08.01.2022
PT10.01.2022
Former [2022/23]AT08.09.2021
CZ08.09.2021
EE08.09.2021
ES08.09.2021
FI08.09.2021
HR08.09.2021
LT08.09.2021
LV08.09.2021
PL08.09.2021
RS08.09.2021
SK08.09.2021
BG08.12.2021
NO08.12.2021
GR09.12.2021
PT10.01.2022
Former [2022/21]AT08.09.2021
ES08.09.2021
FI08.09.2021
HR08.09.2021
LT08.09.2021
LV08.09.2021
RS08.09.2021
BG08.12.2021
NO08.12.2021
GR09.12.2021
Former [2022/10]ES08.09.2021
FI08.09.2021
HR08.09.2021
LT08.09.2021
LV08.09.2021
RS08.09.2021
BG08.12.2021
NO08.12.2021
GR09.12.2021
Former [2022/09]ES08.09.2021
FI08.09.2021
LT08.09.2021
RS08.09.2021
BG08.12.2021
NO08.12.2021
Former [2022/08]ES08.09.2021
FI08.09.2021
LT08.09.2021
BG08.12.2021
NO08.12.2021
Former [2022/07]LT08.09.2021
NO08.12.2021
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2006191788  (WAYMENT HOLLIE [US], et al) [Y] 2,4,8,10,12-15 * paragraphs [0045] , [0052] - [0073] - [0090] - [0097] - [0113] - [0114]; figures 7,10 *;
 [A]US2009294304  (HYLAND MARK [GB], et al) [A] 2 * paragraphs [0005] - [0011] - [0 71]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2009304547  (WERNER KARL [DE], et al) [A] 7,8 * paragraphs [0052] - [0059]; figure 2 *;
 [XYI]US2010159606  (NAKAMINAMI TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,11 * paragraphs [0084] - [0093] - [0106] - [0111] - [0128] - [0135] - [0153] - [0154] - [ 159] * * paragraphs [0165] - [0205]; figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0236] - [0240]; figures 7,8 * [Y] 2,4,8,10,12-15 [I] 5-7,9;
 [A]US2010291611  (BOLBOT JOHN ANTHONY [GB], et al) [A] 2* paragraphs [0512] - [0513] *;
 [A]US2014273269  (LIU WING T [US], et al) [A] 10,12 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US2008076670  (SIVAN URI [IL], et al) [Y] 1-32* , para [0008]-[0360] *;
 [XY]US2012181189  (MERCHANT STEPHEN A [US]) [X] 1, 3/(1), 4, 16, 17/(1) * . Fig. 5; para [0005], [0008], [0020], [0059], [0068], [0073]-[0076], [0081], [0082], [0089]-[0092] * [Y] 2, 3/(2), 5-15, 17/(2), 18-32;
 [Y]US2014069823  (WINARTA HANDANI [US], et al) [Y] 1-32 * , para [0017]-[0142] *;
 [Y]US2014170766  (SMITH HENRY J [US]) [Y] 2, 3/(2), 9-15, 17/(2), 19, 21-23, 28-32 * , para [0010], [0011], [0014], [0015], [0021H0025], 100501. [00521, [00561, [0062] *;
 [Y]US2014262776  (MARTIN GLENN [CA], et al) [Y] 5-8, 13, 15, 18-32 * . Fig. 5; para [0013]-[0015], [0018], [0022], [0066], [0079]-[0084], [0096], [0130] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.