Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3294289

EP3294289 - USE OF CANNABIS TO TREAT FIBROMYALGIA, METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2018Change: Validation statespublished on 22.08.2018  [2018/34]
20.07.2018Change - extension statespublished on 22.08.2018  [2018/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
One World Cannabis Ltd
Ben Gurion 2
Ramat Gan / IL
[2018/23]
Former [2018/12]For all designated states
One World Cannabis Ltd
30 Shacham Street
Petach Tikva / IL
Inventor(s)01 / SINAI, Alon
Ben Gurion 2 St.
Ramat Gan / IL
02 / TURNER, Ziv
Ben Gurion 2 St.
Ramat Gan / IL
03 / BARUCH, Yehuda
10 Pikus St.
Gedera / IL
 [2018/16]
Former [2018/12]01 / SINAI, Alon
30 Shacham Street
Petach Tikva / IL
02 / TURNER, Ziv
30 Shacham Street
Petach Tikva / IL
03 / BARUCH, Yehuda
10 Pikus St.
Gedera / IL
Representative(s)King, Alex , et al
Mathisen & Macara LLP
Communications House
South Street
Staines-upon-Thames, Middx TW18 4PR / GB
[2018/12]
Application number, filing date16792308.511.05.2016
[2018/12]
WO2016IL50498
Priority number, dateUS201562160609P13.05.2015         Original published format: US 201562160609 P
[2018/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016181394
Date:17.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3294289
Date:21.03.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2016
[2018/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IL17.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/352, A61K45/00, A61K9/52, A61P21/06
[2018/12]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/12]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON CANNABIS ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FIBROMYALGIE, VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAVON[2018/12]
English:USE OF CANNABIS TO TREAT FIBROMYALGIA, METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS THEREOF[2018/12]
French:UTILISATION DU CANNABIS POUR TRAITER LA FIBROMYALGIE, MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS ASSOCIÉES[2018/12]
Entry into regional phase16.11.2017National basic fee paid 
16.11.2017Search fee paid 
16.11.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.11.2017Examination requested  [2018/12]
16.11.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2013009928  (ORGANIC MEDICAL RES [CA], et al) [X] 1-10, 17, 19, 22, 23, 25, 26, 39-45, 57, 60-62, 64, 65,78-80 * abstract, para 0002, 0011, 0018, para 0045, 0047-0051, 0053, ex 10, para 0087-0089, cl 4- 5 abstract, para 0002, 0011, 0018, para 0045, 0047-0051, 0053, ex 10, para 0087-0089, cl 4- 5 * [Y] 1-87;
 [XY]US2012231083  (CARLEY DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-5, 9, 12, 13, 16, 17, 19-26, 39-46, 48, 49, 52-54, 57-65, 78-80, 82 * para 0020, 0051,0053,0054, 0060,0099-0108,0133-0146, 0147-0184, 0166, 0187,0201, 0219,0222, 0229, ex 1, ex 12, cl 18 para 0020, 0051,0053,0054, 0060,0099-0108,0133-0146, 0147-0184, 0166, 0187,0201, 0219,0222, 0229, ex 1, ex 12, cl 18 * [Y] 1-87;
 [Y]US2003021752  (WHITTLE BRIAN A [GB], et al) [Y] 11, 14, 15, 18, 27, 33-37, 47, 50, 51, 55, 56, 66, 71-77, 81, 83-87 * para 0065, 0092,0108, 0112,0118, 0142, ex 9, ex 19, cl 9, cl 47, cl 53 *
 [XY]  - JIMENA FIZ et al., "Cannabis Use in Patients with Fibromyalgia: Effect on Symptoms Relief and Health-Related Quality of Life", PLoS One, (20110421), vol. 6, no. 4, page e18440, XP055330487 [X] 1, 3, 4, 6, 7, 16, 17, 19, 25, 28-32, 38, 39, 41, 43, 44, 52-54, 57, 60, 64, 67-70 * whole document whole document * [Y] 1, 3, 4, 6, 7, 16, 17, 19, 25, 28-32, 38, 39, 41, 43, 44, 52-54, 57, 60, 64, 67-70

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0018440
 [XY]  - PAT ANSON, "Marijuana Rated Most Effective for Treating Fibromyalgia", National Pain Report, (20140421), URL: http://nationalpainreport.com/marijuana-rated-most-effective-for-treating-fibromyalgia-8823638. html, XP055330496 [X] 1, 3, 4, 6, 7, 39, 41, 43, 44, 78 * whole document whole document * [Y] 1, 3, 4, 6, 7, 39, 41, 43, 44, 78