Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3296130

EP3296130 - TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.02.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2018/12]
Inventor(s)01 / IWABUCHI, Sotaro
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2018/12]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[2019/44]
Former [2018/12]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date16792803.513.05.2016
[2018/12]
WO2016JP64389
Priority number, dateJP2015009952514.05.2015         Original published format: JP 2015099525
JP2015009952614.05.2015         Original published format: JP 2015099526
JP2015009953114.05.2015         Original published format: JP 2015099531
JP2015009953714.05.2015         Original published format: JP 2015099537
JP2015009952814.05.2015         Original published format: JP 2015099528
JP2015009952714.05.2015         Original published format: JP 2015099527
[2018/12]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016182079
Date:17.11.2016
Language:JA
[2016/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3296130
Date:21.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3296130
Date:30.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP17.11.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:B60C13/00, // B60C13/02, B60C11/13
[2018/22]
Former International [2018/12]B60C13/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/12]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:REIFEN[2018/12]
English:TIRE[2018/12]
French:PNEU[2018/12]
Entry into regional phase08.12.2017Translation filed 
08.12.2017National basic fee paid 
08.12.2017Search fee paid 
08.12.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/12]
08.12.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
11.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2019Fee for grant paid
19.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
11.03.2019Request for further processing filed
11.03.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.03.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]JP2011148338  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1-5,7-9,11-13,15 * figures 3, 4, 6, 8 * [I] 10;
 [E]EP3115230  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [E] 1-4,11-13,15 * figures 1-9 *
International search[XYA]JP2011148338  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1-9, 11-13 * , paragraphs [0020] to [0053]; fig. 3, 4, 6 & US 2012/0273101 A1 paragraphs [0094] to [0123]; fig. 3, 4A to 4C, 6 & US 2015/0314652 A1 & US 2015/0314653 A1 & WO 2011/062241 A1 & EP 2502758 A1 & CN 102612440 A * [Y] 10 [A] 14, 15;
 [Y]JP2011121523  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [Y] 10 * , paragraph [0031]; fig. 10 & US 2011/0139326 A1 paragraph [0045]; fig. 10 & DE 102010061740 A & CN 102092245 A *;
 [PX]JP2015168287  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [PX] 1-9, 11, 15 * , paragraphs [0042] to [0054]; fig. 4, 8, 9 & WO 2015/133245 A1 *;
 [PX]JP2015214186  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [PX] 1, 4, 5, 8, 9, 11-13, 15 * , paragraphs [0026] to [0056]; fig. 12 to 15 & US 2015/0321523 A1 paragraphs [0053] to [0083]; fig. 12 to 15 & DE 102015102614 A & CN 105082889 A *;
 [A]JP2011116306  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-15 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2011062241  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2012/0273101 A1 & US 2015/0314652 A1 & US 2015/0314653 A1 & JP 2011-105231 A & JP 2011-126335 A & JP 2011-148338 A & EP 2502758 A1 & CN 102612440 A *