blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3375215

EP3375215 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING MACHINE ACCESS DATA TO A WIRELESS MEASUREMENT SENSOR OF THE MACHINE, AND MEASUREMENT SENSOR AND MACHINE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.08.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.08.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.05.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.08.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 24.08.2022  [2022/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRUMPF Werkzeugmaschinen GmbH + Co. KG
Johann-Maus-Strasse 2
71254 Ditzingen / DE
For all designated states
TRUMPF Schweiz AG
Trumpf Strasse 8
7214 Grüsch / CH
[2020/39]
Former [2018/38]For all designated states
Trumpf Werkzeugmaschinen GmbH + Co. KG
Johann-Maus-Strasse 2
71254 Ditzingen / DE
For all designated states
Trumpf Maschinen Grüsch AG
Trumpf Strasse 8
7214 Grüsch / CH
Inventor(s)01 / SCHAERER, Andrea
Fanaserstrasse 7
7214 Grüsch / CH
02 / BOCK, Hans-Peter
Pappelweg 10/1
74321 Tamm / DE
03 / GÖRG, Christian
Strombergstr. 8
71696 Möglingen / DE
 [2018/38]
Representative(s)Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
[2018/38]
Application number, filing date16793834.907.11.2016
[2018/38]
WO2016EP76793
Priority number, dateDE20151022239513.11.2015         Original published format: DE102015222395
[2018/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017080941
Date:18.05.2017
Language:DE
[2017/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3375215
Date:19.09.2018
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3375215
Date:30.09.2020
Language:DE
[2020/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.05.2017
ClassificationIPC:H04W12/04, H04W84/12, H04W4/00, H04W12/00, H04W4/70
[2020/20]
CPC:
H04W12/50 (EP,US); H04L67/12 (US); B23Q17/12 (US);
B23Q17/22 (US); B23Q17/2409 (US); H04W4/70 (EP,US);
H04W12/65 (EP,US); H04W12/68 (EP,US); H04W84/12 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2018/38]H04W12/04, H04W84/12, H04W4/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/38]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN VON MASCHINENZUGANGSDATEN AN EINEN DRAHTLOSEN MESSSENSOR DER MASCHINE SOWIE MESSSENSOR UND MASCHINE DAFÜR[2018/38]
English:METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING MACHINE ACCESS DATA TO A WIRELESS MEASUREMENT SENSOR OF THE MACHINE, AND MEASUREMENT SENSOR AND MACHINE THEREFOR[2018/38]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR TRANSMETTRE DES DONNÉES D'ACCÈS MACHINE À UN CAPTEUR DE MESURE SANS FIL DE LA MACHINE ET CAPTEUR DE MESURE ET MACHINE À CET EFFET[2018/38]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2018National basic fee paid 
13.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.03.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/38]
30.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.01.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2020Fee for grant paid
19.08.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.08.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)01.07.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.11.2016
AL30.09.2020
CY30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
MK30.09.2020
MT30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
TR30.09.2020
IE07.11.2020
LU07.11.2020
BE30.11.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
[2022/34]
Former [2022/32]HU07.11.2016
AL30.09.2020
CY30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
MK30.09.2020
MT30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
TR30.09.2020
IE07.11.2020
LU07.11.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2022/27]HU07.11.2016
AL30.09.2020
CY30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
MT30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
TR30.09.2020
IE07.11.2020
LU07.11.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2022/23]AL30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
IE07.11.2020
LU07.11.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2022/10]AL30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
IE07.11.2020
LU07.11.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/50]AL30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
IE07.11.2020
LU07.11.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/48]AL30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
IE07.11.2020
LU07.11.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/46]AL30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
IE07.11.2020
LU07.11.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/37]AL30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
LU07.11.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/33]AL30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
LU07.11.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/31]AL30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/30]AL30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/28]AL30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/25]AL30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/23]CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/22]CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/21]FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/20]FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
Former [2021/10]FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
Former [2021/08]FI30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
Former [2021/07]FI30.09.2020
NO30.12.2020
Cited inInternational search[XYI]DE19933812  (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [X] 1,2,9,13,15 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 13 * * column 2, line 50 - column 4, line 42 * [Y] 10-12 [I] 3-8,16;
 [Y]DE102009009188  (AIRBUS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 10-12 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0031] ** paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052] *;
 [XA]DE102011083817  (TRUMPF WERKZEUGMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 13,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003]; figures 3a,3b * [A] 1-12,14,16;
 [XA]US2014056171  (CLEGG MICHAEL [US]) [X] 13,15 * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0050] * [A] 1-12,16
ExaminationUS2014028818
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.