Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3370627

EP3370627 - ROTARY CUTTER FOR PREPARING THE ACETABULAR SOCKET FOR A HIP IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.10.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.08.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.05.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Embody Orthopaedic Limited
59B Thornhill Road
London N1 1JT / GB
[2018/37]
Inventor(s)01 / WOZENCROFT, Robert
Westview
Horton Lane
Epsom Surrey KT19 8PQ / GB
 [2018/37]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2018/37]
Application number, filing date16794013.907.11.2016
[2018/37]
WO2016GB53474
Priority number, dateGB2015001962406.11.2015         Original published format: GB 201519624
[2018/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017077340
Date:11.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3370627
Date:12.09.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2017
[2018/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/16, A61B17/88
[2018/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/37]
TitleGerman:ROTATIONSFRÄSER ZUR VORBEREITUNG DER HÜFTGELENKPFANNE FÜR EIN HÜFTIMPLANT[2018/37]
English:ROTARY CUTTER FOR PREPARING THE ACETABULAR SOCKET FOR A HIP IMPLANT[2018/37]
French:OUTIL DE COUPE ROTATIF POUR PRÉPARER LA CAVITÉ ACÉTABULAIRE POUR IMPLANT DE HANCHE[2018/37]
Entry into regional phase06.06.2018National basic fee paid 
06.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
06.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/37]
06.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
04.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201803   M06   Fee paid on   19.12.2018
Cited inInternational search[XA]EP2478852  (GREATBATCH LTD [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-14,16-22,28 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0040]; figures 9, 10 * [A] 3;
 [X]US4621637  (FISHBEIN MEYER [US]) [X] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [X]WO2013126416  (BIOMET MFG CORP [US]) [X] 1 * figure 8B *;
 [X]EP2359755  (GREATBATCH LTD [US]) [X] 1 * figure 2 *