Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3370655

EP3370655 - HOLDER FOR AN ACETABULAR CUP IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.08.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.05.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 11.09.2019 [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Embody Orthopaedic Limited
c/o Imperial Innovations Limited
52 Princes Gate
Exhibition Road
London
SW7 2PG / GB
[2018/37]
Inventor(s)01 / WOZENCROFT, Robert
Westview
Horton Lane
Epsom Surrey KT19 8PQ / GB
 [2018/37]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2018/37]
Application number, filing date16794014.707.11.2016
[2018/37]
WO2016GB53475
Priority number, dateGB2015001962606.11.2015         Original published format: GB 201519626
[2018/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017077341
Date:11.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3370655
Date:12.09.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2017
[2018/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/46
[2018/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/37]
TitleGerman:HALTERUNG FÜR EIN HÜFTGELENKPFANNENIMPLANTAT[2018/37]
English:HOLDER FOR AN ACETABULAR CUP IMPLANT[2018/37]
French:SUPPORT POUR COTYLE PROTHÉTIQUE[2018/37]
Entry into regional phase06.06.2018National basic fee paid 
06.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
06.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/37]
06.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.08.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201803   M06   Fee paid on   19.12.2018
Cited inInternational search[XI]FR3008308  (MEDACTA INT SA [CH]) [X] 1-3,6,8-10,12-15,21,23,24,27 * figure 7 * [I] 16,17,19,20,25,28,29,32;
 [XI]GB2522045  (BIOMET UK HEALTHCARE LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3,9,10,12,23,24,27 * figures 8a,8b * [I] 19,20,25,28,32;
 [XI]WO2015044685  (DEPUY IRELAND [IE], et al) [X] 1,4,6,7,9-15,18,21,23,24,27-29,31 * figure 2 * [I] 19,20,25,32;
 [XI]US2010318192  (LAFFAY JEAN-PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 1,4,6,9,10,12,18,21,23,24,27 * figure 3 * [I] 19,20,25,28,31,32