Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469556

EP3469556 - BIOMETRIC IDENTIFIER VALIDATION FOR AN ENTRY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.05.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cubic Corporation
9333 Balboa Avenue
San Diego, CA 92123 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KAYHANI, Niosha
19 Kendal Gardens
Sutton Greater London SM1 3LL / GB
02 / REYMANN, Steffen
30 Doods Place
Doods Road
Reigate Surrey RH2 0NS / GB
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16794453.706.10.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016US55636
Priority number, dateUS201662350110P14.06.2016         Original published format: US 201662350110 P
US20161528617805.10.2016         Original published format: US201615286178
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218028
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469556
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G07B15/02, G06Q20/00, G06Q50/00
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BIOMETRISCHE IDENTIFIKATIONSVALIDIERUNG FÜR EIN EINGABESYSTEM[2019/16]
English:BIOMETRIC IDENTIFIER VALIDATION FOR AN ENTRY SYSTEM[2019/16]
French:VALIDATION D'IDENTIFIANT BIOMÉTRIQUE POUR SYSTÈME D'ENTRÉE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase07.12.2018National basic fee paid 
07.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
07.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.05.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]GB2485442  (CUBIC CORP [US]) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0113] * * figures 1,2,10A-C *;
 [Y]WO2016025529  (CUBIC CORP [US]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0048] *;
 [Y]  - C MORENCY ET AL, "Analysing the Variability of Transit Users Behaviour with Smart Card Data", 2006 IEEE INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION SYSTEMS CONFERENCE : TORONTO, ONTARIO, CANADA, 17 - 20 SEPTEMBER 2006, USA, (2006), doi:10.1109/ITSC.2006.1706716, ISBN 978-1-4244-0093-5, pages 44 - 49, XP055342763 [Y] 1-20 * Item IV, section A. * * figure 1 * * table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ITSC.2006.1706716