Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469781

EP3469781 - DYNAMIC, LOAD-BASED, AUTO-SCALING NETWORK SECURITY MICROSERVICES ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  22.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shieldx Networks, Inc.
2025 Gateway Place Suite 400
San Jose, California 95110 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / AHUJA, Ratinder Paul Singh
24655 Heather HTS
Saratoga California 95070 / US
02 / NEDBAL, Manuel
4516 Carlyle Court 1622
Santa Clara California 95054 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/16]Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date16794811.624.10.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016US58512
Priority number, dateUS20161518257314.06.2016         Original published format: US201615182573
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218029
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469781
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08, H04L29/06
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:DYNAMISCHE LASTBASIERTE ARCHITEKTUR MIT AUTOMATISCHER SKALIERUNG FÜR NETZWERKSICHERHEITSMIKRODIENSTE[2019/16]
English:DYNAMIC, LOAD-BASED, AUTO-SCALING NETWORK SECURITY MICROSERVICES ARCHITECTURE[2019/16]
French:ARCHITECTURE MICROSERVICES DE SÉCURITÉ DE RÉSEAU DYNAMIQUE, BASÉE SUR LA CHARGE ET À MISE À L'ÉCHELLE AUTOMATIQUE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2018National basic fee paid 
20.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/16]
20.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
31.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
14.01.201903   M06   Fee paid on   17.01.2019
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2016094384  (JAIN JAYANT [US], et al) [X] 1,7-10,16-20 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0169] - paragraph [0171] * * paragraph [0186] - paragraph [0199] * * figures 17, 18 * [I] 2-6,11-15;
 [X]  - GIOVANNI TOFFETTI ET AL, "An architecture for self-managing microservices", AUTOMATED INCIDENT MANAGEMENT IN CLOUD, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 NEW YORK NY 10121-0701 USA, (20150421), doi:10.1145/2747470.2747474, ISBN 978-1-4503-3476-1, pages 19 - 24, XP058067235 [X] 1-20 * page 20, column left, line 4 - page 23, column left, paragraph 3 * * figures 1, 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2747470.2747474
 [A]  - James Lewis ET AL, "Microservices", (20140316), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20140316080617/http://martinfowler.com/articles/microservices.html?, (20170220), XP055347623 [A] 1-20 * page 1 *