Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3469781 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3469781



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 219
31.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.07.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
31.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
31.07.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
31.07.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
31.07.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
31.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
25.04.2019 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
20.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
31.01.2019 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
20.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.12.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.01.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 94
21.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
21.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 72
07.03.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
07.03.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
07.03.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4