Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3469781


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
29.10.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
16.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
05.08.2019 Amendment by applicant
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
15.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
15.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  17.04.2019  [2019/16]
25.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
23.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
23.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
02.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
21.12.2018 Change - representative
21.12.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
09.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
28.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
03.03.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
22.11.2016 PCT data prior to European publication