Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3542300

EP3542300 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A PEER-TO-PEER APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Change: Validation statespublished on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
17.01.2020Change - extension statespublished on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Innogy Innovation GmbH
Lysegang 11
45139 Essen / DE
[2019/39]
Inventor(s)01 / STÖCKER, Carsten
Verdistrasse 5
40724 Hilden / DE
 [2019/39]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/39]
Application number, filing date16795336.315.11.2016
[2019/39]
WO2016EP77665
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018091066
Date:24.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3542300
Date:25.09.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2018
[2019/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/64, H04L29/06
[2019/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/39]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER PEER-TO-PEER-ANWENDUNG[2019/39]
English:METHOD FOR OPERATING A PEER-TO-PEER APPLICATION[2019/39]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE APPLICATION DE PAIR À PAIR[2019/39]
Entry into regional phase08.04.2019National basic fee paid 
08.04.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.04.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.09.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/39]
08.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2003070070  (YEAGER WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 1,12-16 * abstract * * figures 2A, 3 * * page 1, paragraph 12 - page 2, paragraph 21 * * page 3, paragraphs 46, 48 * * page 3, paragraph 51 - page 4, paragraph 53 * * page 4, paragraph 57 - page 5, paragraph 63 * * claims 1-36 * [I] 1-16;
 [A]US2003056093  (HUITEMA CHRISTIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 10 - page 2, paragraph 13 * * claims 1-25 *