Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3371774

EP3371774 - METHOD FOR QUANTIFICATION OF IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.05.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Volpara Health Technologies Limited
Level 12
86 Victoria Street
Wellington 6142 / NZ
[2018/37]
Inventor(s)01 / HIGHNAM, Ralph
43B Austin Street
Mount Victoria
Wellington 6011 / NZ
 [2018/37]
Representative(s)Kenny, Andrew
ipconsult
21A Commercial Road
Swanage
Dorset BH19 1DF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/37]Hargreaves, Timothy Edward
Marks & Clerk LLP
40 Torphichen Street
Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB
Application number, filing date16795434.607.11.2016
[2018/37]
WO2016IB56669
Priority number, dateNZ2015015713905.11.2015         Original published format: NZ 15713915
[2018/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017077511
Date:11.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3371774
Date:12.09.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2017
[2018/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06T7/00
[2018/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/37]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR QUANTIFIZIERUNG VON BILDERN[2018/37]
English:METHOD FOR QUANTIFICATION OF IMAGES[2018/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE QUANTIFICATION D'IMAGES[2018/37]
Entry into regional phase29.05.2018National basic fee paid 
29.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/37]
29.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.03.2019Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
10.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Request for further processing for:10.04.2019Request for further processing filed
10.04.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.04.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]GB2474319  (MATAKINA TECHNOLOGY LTD [NZ]) [Y] 5-11,14-16 * abstract * * page 6, line 20 - page 17, line 5 * * page 21, line 19 - page 25, line 10 *
 [A]US2004062429  (KAUFHOLD JOHN PATRICK [US]) [A] 1-28 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0047] *
 [XY]  - VAN ENGELAND S ET AL, "Volumetric Breast Density Estimation From Full-Field Digital Mammograms", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200603), vol. 25, no. 3, doi:10.1109/TMI.2005.862741, ISSN 0278-0062, pages 273 - 282, XP001545771 [X] 1-4,12,13,17-28 * page 274, column l, line 25 - page 276, column r, line 12 * [Y] 5-11,14-16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMI.2005.862741
 [A]  - SERGHEI MALKOV ET AL, Improvements to Single Energy Absorptiometry Method for Digital Mammography to Quantify Breast Tissue Density, DIGITAL MAMMOGRAPHY; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 1 - 8, (20080720), ISBN 978-3-540-70537-6, XP019092053 [A] 1-28 * the whole document *