Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3299305

EP3299305 - ULTRAVIOLET STERILIZATION METHOD, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CONTAINER-PACKAGED PRODUCT, AND ULTRAVIOLET STERILIZATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.02.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 20.02.2019  [2019/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tokuyama Corporation
1-1, Mikage-cho
Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP
[2018/13]
Inventor(s)01 / MATSUI, Shingo
c/o Tokuyama Corporation
1-1 Mikage-cho
Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 745-8648 / JP
 [2018/13]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Straße 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2018/13]
Application number, filing date16796461.816.05.2016
[2018/13]
WO2016JP64437
Priority number, dateJP2015010145919.05.2015         Original published format: JP 2015101459
[2018/13]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016186068
Date:24.11.2016
Language:JA
[2016/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3299305
Date:28.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP24.11.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61L2/10, B65B55/16, B65B55/02
[2019/01]
Former International [2018/13]B65B55/16, A23L3/28, A61L2/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/13]
TitleGerman:ULTRAVIOLETTSTERILISIERUNGSVERFAHREN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON IN BEHÄLTER VERPACKTEM PRODUKT UND ULTRAVIOLETTSTERILISIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2018/13]
English:ULTRAVIOLET STERILIZATION METHOD, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING CONTAINER-PACKAGED PRODUCT, AND ULTRAVIOLET STERILIZATION DEVICE[2018/13]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE STÉRILISATION AUX ULTRAVIOLETS, PROCÉDÉ POUR FABRIQUER UN PRODUIT EMBALLÉ DANS UN RÉCIPIENT, ET DISPOSITIF DE STÉRILISATION AUX ULTRAVIOLETS[2018/13]
Entry into regional phase16.11.2017Translation filed 
16.11.2017National basic fee paid 
16.11.2017Search fee paid 
16.11.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.2017Examination requested  [2018/13]
16.11.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.01.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2008669  (MACO PHARMA SA [FR]) [A] 1,3,4,7,8,10 * paragraphs [0011] - [0016] - [0022] - [0026] - [0041] - [0043] - [0061] - [0066]; figures 1,2,6 *;
 [A]EP0912111  (PUREPULSE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4,6-8,10 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] , [0036] - [0038] - [0040] , [0043] , [0046] , [0059] - [0061]; figures 1,8 *;
 [A]US2013181141  (BRUECK DANIEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-4,6-8,10 * paragraphs [0018] - [0022] - [0029] , [0032] , [0036]; figure 5 *
International search[XYA]JP2000511497  (Purepulse Technologies, Inc.) [X] 1-6, 9 * , page 13, line 6 to page 36, line 15; fig. 1 to 12 & US 5786598 A column 5, line 35 to column 12, line 14; fig. 1 to 8 & US 5925885 A & US 6433344 B1 & US 6566659 B1 & US 2003/0155531 A1 & WO 1997/043915 A1 & EP 1413318 A1 & DE 69726425 T2 & AU 3000797 A & CA 2254977 A1 & AU 710860 B2 * [Y] 8 [A] 7, 10-13;
 [Y]JP2002068202  (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD) [Y] 8 * , paragraphs [0011] to [0013]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2005052294  (IWASAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * , (Family: none) *;
 [A]GB2457057  (GB ENVIRONMENTAL LTD [GB]) [A] 1-13 * , (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2014516013  (Ozonica Ltd.) [A] 1-13 * , & US 2012/0288405 A1 & US 2014/0119991 A1 & GB 2490794 A & WO 2012/153134 A2 & AU 2012252164 A1 & CA 2835562 A1 & CN 103619712 A & MX 2013013107 A & RU 2013154490 A & NZ 618094 A & ZA 201308984 B *;
 [A]JP2007126189  (IWASAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * , (Family: none) *