Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3294381 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3294381



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 309
05.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
05.08.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
05.08.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
05.08.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 8
05.08.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 10
05.08.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
05.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
16.01.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.01.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 5
16.01.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
16.01.2019 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
03.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
03.08.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
03.08.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
03.08.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
03.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.04.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.04.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.03.2018 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
20.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.03.2018 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
20.03.2018 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 2
13.03.2018 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
12.03.2018 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
05.03.2018 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
21.02.2018 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
25.01.2018 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
23.01.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.01.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.01.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.01.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.01.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.12.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
05.12.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
29.09.2017 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
12.12.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 53
24.11.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
24.11.2016 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 153