Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3297786

EP3297786 - ROBOTICALLY CONTROLLED GAS TUNGSTEN ARC WELDER AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Schweiz AG
Brown Boveri Strasse 6
5400 Baden / CH
For all designated states
Oxlade, Mark X.
1250 Brown Road
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
For all designated states
Kuppe, Chris E.
1250 Brown Road
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
For all designated states
Lirell, Magnus
1250 Brown Road
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
[2018/13]
Inventor(s)01 / OXLADE, Mark, X.
1250 Brown Road
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
02 / KUPPE, Chris, E.
1250 Brown Road
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
03 / LIRELL, Magnus
1250 Brown Road
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
 [2018/13]
Representative(s)Gregorj S.r.l.
Via L. Muratori, 13/b
20135 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2018/13]Boussicault, Fabien , et al
Gregorj S.r.l. Intellectual Property
Via L. Muratori, 13/b
20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date16797117.516.05.2016
[2018/13]
WO2016US32772
Priority number, dateUS20151471466318.05.2015         Original published format: US201514714663
[2018/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016187153
Date:24.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/47]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3297786
Date:28.03.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2016
[2018/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.11.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:B23K9/12, B23K9/00, B23K9/32, B23K9/02, B23K9/10
[2019/20]
Former International [2018/13]B23K9/12, B23K9/00, B23K9/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/13]
TitleGerman:ROBOTERGESTEUERTE GAS-WOLFRAM-LICHTBOGENSCHWEISSMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB DAVON[2018/13]
English:ROBOTICALLY CONTROLLED GAS TUNGSTEN ARC WELDER AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SAME[2018/13]
French:APPAREIL ROBOTISÉ DE SOUDAGE À L'ARC AU GAZ DE TUNGSTÈNE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT[2018/13]
Entry into regional phase15.12.2017National basic fee paid 
15.12.2017Search fee paid 
15.12.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
15.12.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/13]
15.12.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]US4531040  (NAWA AKIYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 3; figures 2,8; claims 1-10 *;
 [Y]US2006000817  (INOUE TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0057] - [0065]; figures 4a,12 *;
 [Y]US2005072764  (LAJOIE ROBERT [CA]) [Y] 4,5 * paragraph [0029] *;
 [A]US2003062354  (WARD JOSEPH J [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2269759  (TECNOELETTRA SPA [IT]) [A] 5 * paragraph [0070] *;
 [XI]JP2001079664  (HITACHI LTD) [X] 6,7,9-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] - [0019]; figure 5 * [I] 8,16;
 [X]JP2008114279  (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 6,7,9-12 * par. 92, 93,96; fig. 1 *;
 [X]US2006124603  (KITAMURA KAORU [JP], et al) [X] 6,7,9-12 * fig. 2; par. 9, 40, 41, 60, 61, 66 *;
 [A]US5770834  (DAVIS PATRICK S [US], et al) [A] 8 * figure 4 *;
 [A]WO2013136638  (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 16 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - Anonymous, "Line Them Up", (20120628), URL: http://www.weldingandgasestoday.org/index.php/2012/06/line-them-up/, (20190122), XP055546166 [Y] 4,5 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US4531040  (NAWA AKIYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2006000817  (INOUE TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * entire document *;
 [Y]US2005072764  (LAJOIE ROBERT [CA]) [Y] 4, 5 * entire document *;
 [A]US4540871  (CORRIGALL DON J [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * entire document *;
 [A]US5233150  (SCHNEEBELI FRITZ [CH], et al) [A] 1-5 * entire document *;
 [A]US2003062354  (WARD JOSEPH J [US]) [A] 1-5 * entire document *