Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3377031

EP3377031 - ODOR NEUTRALIZER FOR AMMONIA AND PRIMARY OR SECONDARY AMINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  28.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Firmenich SA
1, route des Jeunes
P.O. Box 239
1211 Geneva 8 / CH
[2018/39]
Inventor(s)01 / BEAUSSOUBRE, Pascal
Firmenich SA
1 Route des Jeunes
1211 Geneva 8 / CH
02 / FIEBER, Wolfgang
Firmenich SA
1 Route des Jeunes
1211 Geneva 8 / CH
 [2018/39]
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian , et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/39]Lavy, Séverine
Firmenich SA
1 route des Jeunes
BP 239
1211 Genève 8 / CH
Application number, filing date16797885.716.11.2016
[2018/39]
WO2016EP77913
Priority number, dateEP2015019466516.11.2015         Original published format: EP 15194665
[2018/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017085152
Date:26.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3377031
Date:26.09.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017
[2018/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/49, A61Q15/00, A61L9/01, C11D3/20
[2018/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/39]
TitleGerman:GERUCHSNEUTRALISATOR FÜR AMMONIAK UND PRIMÄRE ODER SEKUNDÄRE AMINE[2018/39]
English:ODOR NEUTRALIZER FOR AMMONIA AND PRIMARY OR SECONDARY AMINES[2018/39]
French:NEUTRALISEUR D'ODEUR POUR L'AMMONIAC ET LES AMINES PRIMAIRES OU SECONDAIRES[2018/39]
Entry into regional phase18.06.2018National basic fee paid 
18.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.04.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/39]
03.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
02.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]EP2380958  (PROCTER & GAMBLE) [X] 7,8,10,11 * example -; claim 1 *
 [X]WO03048293  (HENKEL KGAA) [X] 7,8,10,11 * claims 1,4 *
 [X]EP1122302  (HENKEL KGAA) [X] 7,10,11 * examples 7,8,19-23 *
 [X]EP1060737  (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH) [X] 7,10,11 * claims 1,3 *
 [X]DE19858812  (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH) [X] 7,10,11 * example -; claims 1,2 *
 [X]WO2004031167  (BASF AG) [X] 7,10,11 * example -; claim - *
 [X]JP2001294890  (LION CORP) [X] 7,10,11 * abstract *
 [AD]JPH02302258  (YUUKOU YAKUHIN KOGYO KK) [AD] 1-15 * abstract *
 US6015550  [ ]
 WO9946350  [ ]
 JPH02302258  [ ]
 EP1145723  [ ]
 WO2008155683  [ ]
 EP2542704  [ ]
    [ ] - "Method for Assessing the Efficacy of Air Care Products in Reducing Sensorly Perceived Indoor Air Malodor Intensity", ASTM E 1593-06