Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3174375

EP3174375 - COMPLEX SHEET FOR ABSORBING/EXTINGUISHING AND SHIELDING ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVES AND HIGHLY DISSIPATING HEAT FROM ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  28.04.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  21.03.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2018Change: Validation statespublished on 12.12.2018 [2018/50]
09.11.2018New entry: Reply to examination report 
09.11.2018Change - extension statespublished on 12.12.2018 [2018/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Joo, Hak Sik
(Samseong-dong) 37
Yeongdong-daero 114-gil
Gangnam-gu
Seoul
06081 / KR
[2017/22]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2017/22]
Representative(s)Modiano, Gabriella Diana , et al
Modiano & Partners (DE)
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2017/22]
Application number, filing date16798613.206.09.2016
[2017/22]
WO2016KR09948
Priority number, dateKR2015012608507.09.2015         Original published format: KR 20150126085
KR2015012608607.09.2015         Original published format: KR 20150126086
KR2015014775023.10.2015         Original published format: KR 20150147750
KR2015014775123.10.2015         Original published format: KR 20150147751
KR2016009051118.07.2016         Original published format: KR 20160090511
KR2016009051218.07.2016         Original published format: KR 20160090512
[2017/22]
Filing languageKO
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017043831
Date:16.03.2017
Language:KO
[2017/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3174375
Date:31.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR16.03.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:H05K7/20, B32B15/08, B32B9/00, H05K9/00, H01L23/373
[2018/14]
Former International [2017/22]H05K7/20, B32B15/08, B32B9/00, H05K9/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/22]
TitleGerman:KOMPLEXE FOLIE ZUM ABSORBIEREN/LÖSCHEN UND ABSCHIRMEN VON ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN WELLEN SOWIE HOCHGRADIGEM WÄRMEABLEITEN VON EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2017/22]
English:COMPLEX SHEET FOR ABSORBING/EXTINGUISHING AND SHIELDING ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVES AND HIGHLY DISSIPATING HEAT FROM ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR[2017/22]
French:FEUILLE COMPLEXE POUR L'ABSORPTION/EXTINCTION ET LE BLINDAGE CONTRE LES ONDES ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUES ET LA DISSIPATION ÉLEVÉE DE CHALEUR D'UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2017/22]
Entry into regional phase01.12.2016Translation filed 
01.12.2016National basic fee paid 
01.12.2016Search fee paid 
01.12.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
Examination procedure01.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/30]
11.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
30.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US2015173176  (LEE HEE-KWON [KR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0062] *;
 [A]US2005150596  (VARGO TERRENCE G [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0038] *;
 [A]EP2763520  (LAIRD TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] *;
 [A]US2014116661  (XU YAN [CN], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0105] *
International search[YA]JP2005229100  (JAPAN MATEKKUSU KK) [Y] 1-4, 6-9, 11-17 , 19-22, 24-26 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0047] and figures 1-9. * [A] 5, 10, 18, 23;
 [Y]KR20070079891  (KIM GYOUNG IL [KR]) [Y] 1-4, 6-9, 11-17 , 19-22, 24-26 * See paragraphs [0012]-[0015] and claim 8. *;
 [Y]KR101280681B  (JOO HAK SIK [KR]) [Y] 3, 8, 16, 21 * See paragraphs [0032]-[0047] and figure 1. *;
 [A]JP2015156490  (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-26 * See paragraphs [0009]-[0037] and claim 1. *;
 [A]KR20120073792  (YOULCHON CHEMICAL CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-26 * See claims 1-24 and figure 2. *
by applicantKR100755014B