Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3376907

EP3376907 - ELECTRIC MOTOR-DRIVEN FURNITURE DRIVE, FURNITURE AND METHODS FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTRIC MOTOR-DRIVEN FURNITURE DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.07.2019
Database last updated on 23.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.08.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 21.08.2019 [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DewertOkin GmbH
Weststraße 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[2019/34]
Former [2018/39]For all designated states
Dewertokin GmbH
Weststraße 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
Inventor(s)01 / VIERMANN, Thomas
Ostensiekerweg 11
32584 Löhne / DE
02 / KRACHT, Werner
Hauptstrasse 6
32609 Hüllhorst / DE
03 / TEWS, Alexander
Mühlenstrasse 71
33607 Bielefeld / DE
 [2018/39]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/39]
Application number, filing date16798676.911.11.2016
[2018/39]
WO2016EP77490
Priority number, dateDE201520106208U16.11.2015         Original published format: DE 202015106208 U
[2018/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017084984
Date:26.05.2017
Language:DE
[2017/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3376907
Date:26.09.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017
[2018/39]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP3376907
Date:21.08.2019
Language:DE
[2019/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:A47C31/00, H04W48/04, A47C20/04
[2018/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/39]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTROMOTORISCHER MÖBELANTRIEB, MÖBEL UND VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINES ELEKTROMOTORISCHEN MÖBELANTRIEBS[2018/39]
English:ELECTRIC MOTOR-DRIVEN FURNITURE DRIVE, FURNITURE AND METHODS FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTRIC MOTOR-DRIVEN FURNITURE DRIVE[2018/39]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR MEUBLE À MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE, MEUBLE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMANDER UN DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR MEUBLE À MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE[2018/39]
Entry into regional phase25.05.2018National basic fee paid 
25.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
25.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/39]
25.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2019Fee for grant paid
09.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2015019020  (HILLE ARMIN [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2015189425  (PANG HAWK YIN [US]) [A] 1-4,9-14 * paragraphs [0025] , [0063]; figures 1,8 *;
 [A]US2015082542  (HAYES MICHAEL JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0062] - paragraphs [0067] , [0082]; figures 1,3 *