Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3325733

EP3325733 - LIGHT FIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.02.2020
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.04.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip14.02.2020First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino CA 95014 / US
[2018/31]
Former [2018/22]For all designated states
Apple Inc.
One Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RICHTER, Bernd
c/o Richter Lighting Technologies GmbH
Böbinger Strasse 34
73540 Heubach / DE
02 / FEENEY, Casey
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
MS 25-RD
Cupertino, California 95014 / US
03 / COOK, Michael
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
MS 52-RD
Cupertino, California 95014 / US
04 / PEAK, Christopher Daniel
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
MS 25-RD
Cupertino, California 95014 / US
05 / JÄCKL, Matthais
c/o Richter Lighting Technologies GmbH
Böbinger Strasse 34
73540 Heubach / DE
06 / RÖHRER, Sebastian
c/o Richter Lighting Technologies GmbH
Böbinger Strasse 34
73540 Heubach / DE
07 / HENNESSY, Sean
c/o Hennessy Lighting Design LLC
P.O. Box 42162
Portland, Oregon 97242 / US
 [2018/22]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2018/22]
Application number, filing date16798897.109.11.2016
[2018/22]
WO2016US61057
Priority number, dateUS20151493649309.11.2015         Original published format: US201514936493
[2018/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017083332
Date:18.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3325733
Date:30.05.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2017
[2018/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:E04B9/32, F21S8/02, F21V11/14, F21V13/02, E04B9/04, F21Y115/10
[2018/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/22]
TitleGerman:BELEUCHTUNGSKÖRPER[2018/22]
English:LIGHT FIXTURE[2018/22]
French:APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE[2018/22]
Entry into regional phase22.02.2018National basic fee paid 
22.02.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
22.02.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/22]
22.02.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.02.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE202013105914U  (ZUMTOBEL LIGHTING GMBH [AT]) [Y] 1-19 * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0032]; figures 3,5b *;
 [Y]GB2365108  (DESIGNED ARCHITECTURAL LIGHTIN [GB]) [Y] 1-19 * page 2, line 22 - line 24 * * page 3, line 1 - line 13 * * figure - *;
 [A]US6623142  (LIPPMANN RAY [US], et al) [A] 20,26 * column 2, line 1 - line 9 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 14 * * column 4, line 15 - line 22 * * figure - * * column 4, line 39 - line 48 *;
 [A]EP2472174  (NORMALU [FR]) [A] 1,20,26 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0002] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE20103644U  (ROSIN AYAL [DE]) [A] 1,20,26 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2221528  (ZUMTOBEL LIGHTING GMBH [AT]) [A] 1,20,26 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0023] * * column 3, line 17 - line 23 * * page 3; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]DE102013016842  (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1,20,26 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2013133147  (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,20,26 * abstract *