Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3373864

EP3373864 - JOINT IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2018/38]JOINT IMPLANTS AND METHODS
[2019/19]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.05.2019
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.08.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.05.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
56 East Bell Drive
Warsaw, IN 46582 / US
[2018/38]
Inventor(s)01 / ANDERSON, David M.
1886 Legacy Lane
Winona Lake, Indiana 56490 / US
02 / BERELSMAN, Brian K.
3416 S. Wildwood Trail
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
 [2018/38]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2018/38]
Application number, filing date16801112.011.11.2016
[2018/38]
WO2016US61627
Priority number, dateUS201562254282P12.11.2015         Original published format: US 201562254282 P
[2018/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017083718
Date:18.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3373864
Date:19.09.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2017
[2018/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/28, A61F2/42
[2019/19]
Former International [2018/38]A61F2/28
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/38]
TitleGerman:GELENKIMPLANTATE[2019/19]
English:JOINT IMPLANTS[2019/19]
French:IMPLANTS D'ARTICULATION[2019/19]
Former [2018/38]GELENKIMPLANTATE UND VERFAHREN
Former [2018/38]JOINT IMPLANTS AND METHODS
Former [2018/38]IMPLANTS D'ARTICULATION ET MÉTHODES
Entry into regional phase12.06.2018National basic fee paid 
12.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/38]
12.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational searchUS5282861  [ ]
 US9301766  [ ]
 [X]US2011035013  (WINSLOW NATHAN A [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3-9,12-16,18-20 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0051] * * figures 1,6A,8A,16-18B,20 *
 [X]US2010268337  (GORDON JEFFREY D [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0108] * * paragraph [0144] - paragraph [0145] * * figures 2B,2C,11A-12C *
 [X]US2009312842  (BURSAC PREDRAG [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,6 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0180] - paragraph [0182] * * figures 2-3D *
 [A]US2010009103  (KUBOKI YOSHINORI [JP] ET AL) [A] 1 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0057] * * figure 1 *
    [ ] - LEVINE, B.R. ET AL., "Experimental and Clinical Performance of Porous Tantalum in Orthopedic Surgery", BIOMATERIALS, (2006), vol. 27, pages 4671 - 4681