blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3373864 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3373864



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 213
16.05.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
16.05.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
16.05.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.05.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
16.05.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 23
01.04.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
30.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.01.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
30.01.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
30.01.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
30.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.08.2018 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
22.08.2018 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
22.08.2018 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.07.2018 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
18.07.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
18.07.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
12.06.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
12.06.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.05.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
23.03.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
17.07.2017 Annex International Searching Authority 2
17.07.2017 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 2
17.07.2017 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 1
17.07.2017 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 1
09.06.2017 Annex International Searching Authority 2
09.06.2017 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
09.06.2017 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 1
07.06.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 28
18.05.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
18.05.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 29
10.02.2017 ISR: cited documents (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
08.02.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
08.02.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
08.02.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
06.12.2016 Notification of receipt of Search copy (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
24.11.2016 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
24.11.2016 Annex International Searching Authority 3
24.11.2016 Claims International Searching Authority 4
24.11.2016 Description International Searching Authority 15
24.11.2016 Drawings International Searching Authority 9
24.11.2016 Fee calculation sheet for an international application International Searching Authority 2
24.11.2016 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 1
24.11.2016 Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 2
24.11.2016 Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
24.11.2016 Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 4