blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3373864 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201680072751 EP16801112



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2017135821Global Dossier 18.05.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201615349752 11.11.2016
US201562254282 12.11.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2018533433Global Dossier 15.11.2018A
Priority number Date
WO2016US61627 11.11.2016
US201562254282 12.11.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108366860Global Dossier 03.08.2018A
Priority number Date
WO2016US61627 11.11.2016
US201562254282 12.11.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3005228Global Dossier 18.05.2017A1
Priority number Date
WO2016US61627 11.11.2016
US201562254282 12.11.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3373864Global Dossier 19.09.2018A1
Priority number Date
WO2016US61627 11.11.2016
US201562254282 12.11.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2016353265B 29.08.2019B2
AU2016353265 07.06.2018A1
Priority number Date
WO2016US61627 11.11.2016
US201562254282 12.11.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2017083718Global Dossier 18.05.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201562254282 12.11.2015