Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3378006

EP3378006 - METHOD FOR LOADING A SECURED MEMORY IMAGE OF A MICROCONTROLLER, AND ASSEMBLY COMPRISING A MICROCONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.04.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.08.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  06.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2019Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
[2018/39]
Inventor(s)01 / STRÜNKMANN, Marc
Zum Kampe 9
33104 Paderborn / DE
02 / GURLT, Ingo
Ravensbergerstrasse 72
33602 Bielefeld / DE
03 / BÖCKSTIEGEL, Andreas
Bachstrasse 58
33813 Oerlinghausen / DE
 [2018/39]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/39]
Application number, filing date16801405.816.11.2016
[2018/39]
WO2016EP77830
Priority number, dateDE20151011980216.11.2015         Original published format: DE102015119802
[2018/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017085108
Date:26.05.2017
Language:DE
[2017/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3378006
Date:26.09.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017
[2018/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/57
[2018/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/39]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM LADEN EINES SICHEREN SPEICHERABBILDS EINES MIKROCONTROLLERS UND ANORDNUNG MIT EINEM MIKROCONTROLLER[2018/39]
English:METHOD FOR LOADING A SECURED MEMORY IMAGE OF A MICROCONTROLLER, AND ASSEMBLY COMPRISING A MICROCONTROLLER[2018/39]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CHARGEMENT D'UNE IMAGE DE MÉMOIRE SÉCURISÉE D'UN MICROCONTRÔLEUR ET DISPOSITIF ÉQUIPÉ D'UN MICROCONTRÔLEUR[2018/39]
Entry into regional phase07.05.2018National basic fee paid 
07.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
07.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/39]
07.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US9165143  (SANDERS LESTER S [US] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * figure 6A * * figure 6B *
 [A]US2013013906  (BROWN JOHN R [US] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * figure 2 *
 [A]US5893923  (BUSH CRAIG PALMER [US] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *