Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3362001

EP3362001 - BREAST PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amoena Medizin-Orthopädie-Technik GmbH
Kapellenweg 36
83064 Raubling / DE
[2018/34]
Inventor(s)01 / STELTER, Nils
An der Hochstrasse 8
83112 Frasdorf / DE
 [2018/34]
Representative(s)Laufhütte, Dieter
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 23
80538 München / DE
[2018/34]
Application number, filing date16801706.911.11.2016
[2018/34]
WO2016EP01880
Priority number, dateDE20152007895U13.11.2015         Original published format: DE 202015007895 U
[2018/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017080664
Date:18.05.2017
Language:DE
[2017/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3362001
Date:22.08.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2017
[2018/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/52
[2018/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/34]
TitleGerman:BRUSTPROTHESE[2018/34]
English:BREAST PROSTHESIS[2018/34]
French:PROTHÈSE MAMMAIRE[2018/34]
Entry into regional phase16.05.2018National basic fee paid 
16.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
16.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/34]
16.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XYI]DE202004011988U  (AMOENA MED ORTHOPAEDIE TECH [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10 * paragraphs [0013] , [0018] - [0020] - [0032] , [0034] , [0036] , [0037] , [0041]; figures 1,5 * [Y] 1-10 [I] 9
 [Y]US6042608  (ISHIKAWA SUGURU [JP] ET AL) [Y] 1-10 * column 5, lines 4-35; figure 1(a) * * column 7, line 21 - column 8, line 20 *
 [Y]US2011245921  (STELTER NILS [DE] ET AL) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0033] - [0043]; figures 1-4 *
 [YD]DE29516281U  (AMOENA MED ORTHOPAEDIE TECH [DE]) [YD] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [Y]DE2457041  (OTTO THAEMERT TEXTIL UND KUNST) [Y] 1-7 * column 4, lines 44-54; figure 4 *