Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3383446

EP3383446 - METHOD FOR INACTIVATING XENOANTIGENS IN BIOLOGICAL TISSUES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.08.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.09.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2019Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biocompatibility Innovation Srl
Via Enrico Petrella 4
35132 Padova / IT
[2018/41]
Inventor(s)01 / NASO, Filippo
Via Palugana Nord 55/B
35045 Ospedaletto Euganeo / IT
02 / GANDAGLIA, Alessandro
Via Como 8
35030 Rubano / IT
 [2018/41]
Representative(s)Croce, Valeria
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2018/41]Rigamonti, Dorotea
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date16801773.925.11.2016
[2018/41]
WO2016EP78898
Priority number, dateIT2015UB0601930.11.2015         Original published format: IT UB20156019
[2018/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017093147
Date:08.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3383446
Date:10.10.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2017
[2018/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61L27/36
[2018/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/41]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DEAKTIVIERUNG VON XENOANTIGENEN IN BIOLOGISCHEN GEWEBEN[2018/41]
English:METHOD FOR INACTIVATING XENOANTIGENS IN BIOLOGICAL TISSUES[2018/41]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'INACTIVATION DE HÉTÉRO-ANTIGÈNES DANS DES TISSUS BIOLOGIQUES[2018/41]
Entry into regional phase31.05.2018National basic fee paid 
31.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
31.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/41]
31.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2004047620  (UNIV CLEMSON [US]) [X] 1-6,8,11,13-15 * paragraphs [0040] - [0045] * * claim 1 * [Y] 7,9,10,12;
 [Y]WO2007133479  (COOK INC [US], et al) [Y] 7,9,10,12 * page 14 * * tables A-S *
by applicantIT1409783
 EP2626701
    - NKOMO VT ET AL., "Burden of valvular heart diseases: a population-based study", LANCET, (2006), vol. 368, pages 1005 - 1011
    - ZENG LY ET AL., "A prompt method to quantitative assay of alpha-Gal on pig cell surface without injury", SICHUAN DA XUE XUE BAO YI XUE BAN, (2005), vol. 36, no. 3, pages 419 - 421
    - GALILI U ET AL., "A sensitive assay for measuring alpha Gal epitope expression on cells by a monoclonal anti-Gal antibody", TRANSPLANTATION, (1998), vol. 65, pages 1129 - 1132
    - CHEN RH ET AL., "alpha-Gal and beta-Gal are preferentially expressed on porcine cardiac microvascular endothelium", TRANSPLANT PROC, (2000), vol. 32, pages 877 - 878
    - FENG W ET AL., "Distribution of the Alpha-Gal epitope on adult porcine bone tissue", TRANSPLANT. PROCEED, (2006), vol. 38, pages 2247 - 2251
    - GALILI U, "The alpha Gal epitope and the anti-Gal antibody in xenotransplantation and in cancer immunotherapy", IMMUN CELL BIOL, (2005), vol. 83, pages 674 - 686
    - KONAKCI KZ ET AL., "Alpha-Gal on bioprostheses: xenograft immune response in cardiac surgery", EUR J CLIN INVEST, (2005), vol. 35, no. 1, pages 17 - 23
    - PARK CS ET AL., "Anti alpha-gal immune response following porcine bioprosthesis implantation in children", J HEART VALVE DIS, (2010), vol. 19, no. 1, pages 124 - 130
    - LILA N ET AL., "Gal knockout pig pericardium: new source of material for heart valve bioprostheses", J HEART LUNG TRANSPLANT, (2010), vol. 29, no. 5, pages 538 - 543
    - NASO F ET AL., "First quantitative assay of alpha- Gal in soft tissues: presence and distribution of the epitope before and after cell removal from xenogeneic heart valves.", ACTA BIOMATER, (2011), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 1728 - 1734
    - NASO F ET AL., "First quantification of alpha-Gal epitope in current glutaraldehyde-fixed heart valve bioprostheses", XENOTRANSPLANTATION, (2013), vol. 20, no. 4, pages 252 - 261