Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3305834

EP3305834 - RUBBER COMPOSITION PRODUCTION METHOD AND TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2018
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.03.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2018/15]
Inventor(s)01 / SAKURAI, Hideyuki
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2018/15]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/15]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date16802752.211.05.2016
[2018/15]
WO2016JP02309
Priority number, dateJP2015011330303.06.2015         Original published format: JP 2015113303
[2018/15]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016194309
Date:08.12.2016
Language:JA
[2016/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3305834
Date:11.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.12.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:C08J3/20, C08L7/00, C08K3/36
[2018/19]
Former International [2018/15]C08J3/20, C08L7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/15]
TitleGerman:KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNGHERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND REIFEN[2018/15]
English:RUBBER COMPOSITION PRODUCTION METHOD AND TIRE[2018/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC ET PNEU[2018/15]
Entry into regional phase01.12.2017Translation filed 
01.12.2017National basic fee paid 
01.12.2017Search fee paid 
01.12.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
01.12.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/15]
01.12.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
23.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2014329946  (HORIE SATOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0017] , [ 0029] - [0033] - [ 0084] - [0092] - [ 0104] , [ 0117] , [ 0120] , [ 0121] * * paragraphs [0125] , [ 0128] , [ 0130] , [ 0136] , [ 0137] * * examples 7-9, 21-23, 36-39 * * claims 1, 5, 8, 10, 12, 20, 25, 29, 30, 33, 37, 38 *;
 [Y]US2014350174  (YUKIMURA NORIAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0017] - [0029] - [ 0031] , [ 0033] , [ 0035] , [ 0041] , [ 0093] , [ 0096] * * examples 10-12 * * claims 1, 2, 6, 7 *;
 [Y]EP2799480  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [ 0014] , [ 0015] , [ 0036] , [ 0041] , [ 0055] * * examples 1-23 * * claims 1, 2, 7, 8 *;
 [Y]WO2015076048  ;
 [Y]US2011144236  (MIHARA SATOSHI [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0003] , [ 0007] , [ 0010] , [ 0011] , [ 0022] , [ 0028] - [0030] - [ 0034] * * examples 1-4, 7 * * claims 1, 7-9, 20 *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, (20150528), vol. 2015, no. 38, Database accession no. 2015-31641W, XP002779684 & WO2015076048 A1 20150528 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0064] * * examples 1-25 * * claims 1, 4 *
International search[X]JP2014534283  (Compagnie Generale des Etablissements Michelin) [X] 1-5 * , claims; paragraphs [0001], [0013] to [0046], [0057] to [0063], [0066], [0072] to [0075], [0082]; table 1 & US 2014/0243448 A1 claims; paragraphs [0001], [0018] to [0067], [0077] to [0089], [0092] to [0093], [0099] to [0102]; table 1 & EP 2760929 A & CN 103987773 A *;
 [Y]JP2010254740  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [Y] 1-5 * , claims 1 to 2, 4 to 9; paragraphs [0001], [0006], [0011] to [0024], [0027] to [0039]; all tables (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2002521516  (Societe de Technologie Michelin) [Y] 1-5 * , claims 24, 27; paragraphs [0005] to [0018], [0020] to [0037], [0043], [0057] to [0058] & US 2001/0034389 A1 claims 26, 30; paragraphs [0016] to [0027], [0030] to [0038], [0043] to [0132], [0162] to [0169], [0211] to [0212] & EP 1102812 A & CN 1318086 A *;
 [Y]WO2012043853  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0007], [0009] to [0024] & US 2013/0261242 A1 claim 1; paragraphs [0020], [0022] to [0057] & EP 2623546 A1 & CN 103189424 A & KR 10-2013-0099084 A *;
 [Y]JP2006063093  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [Y] 1-5 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0010] to [0024], [0028], [0030] to [0039]; table 1 (Family: none) *