Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3304116

EP3304116 - MOBILE DEVICE LOCATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HANGIT LLC
8875 Hidden River Parkway Suite 300
Tampa, FL 33637 / US
[2018/15]
Inventor(s)01 / JOHNS, Nicholas, Patrick
c/o Hangit LLC
8875 Hidden River Parkway
Suite 300
Tampa, FL 33637 / US
02 / MOREIRA, Cory, A.
c/o Hangit LLC
8875 Hidden River Parkway
Suite 300
Tampa, FL 33637 / US
 [2018/15]
Representative(s)Clark, Jane Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2018/15]
Application number, filing date16804445.102.06.2016
[2018/15]
WO2016US35536
Priority number, dateUS201562169904P02.06.2015         Original published format: US 201562169904 P
[2018/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016196807
Date:08.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3304116
Date:11.04.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016
[2018/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR08.12.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:G01S19/34, G01S19/48
[2019/20]
Former International [2018/15]G01S1/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/15]
TitleGerman:LOKALISIERUNG EINER MOBILEN VORRICHTUNG[2018/15]
English:MOBILE DEVICE LOCATION[2018/15]
French:LOCALISATION DE DISPOSITIF MOBILE[2018/15]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2017National basic fee paid 
19.12.2017Search fee paid 
19.12.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/15]
19.12.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201803   M06   Fee paid on   03.12.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2014169343  (BLUEDOT INNOVATIONS PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0106]; figures 1-10 *;
 [X]WO2015006819  (GEOMOBY PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0101] - [0116] - [0134]; figures 3-6 *;
 [A]US2012119948  (TSUDA SHINICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0099]; figures 1-4 *
International search[X]US2011279323  (HUNG MICHAEL HIN KAI [CA], et al) [X] 1 * See abstract, claims 1-3 and figures 1-2(b). *;
 [A]US2007111735  (SRINIVASAN BHASKAR [US], et al) [A] 1 * See claims 1-6 and figures 2-4. *;
 [A]US2014280541  (WALTER JENNIFER LYNN [US], et al) [A] 1 * See abstract and figures 1-5. *;
 [A]US2010283676  (HATAMI NAQUIB U [US], et al) [A] 1 * See figures 1-11. *;
 [A]US2011140849  (MATUS JOSE ADALBERTO TERAN [MX], et al) [A] 1 * See abstract and figure 1. *
by applicantWO2014169343
 WO2015006819
 US2013346205