Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3302227

EP3302227 - METHODS AND APPARATUS TO MEASURE FAST-PACED PERFORMANCE OF PEOPLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.2020Amendment by applicant 
20.01.2020New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sportssense, Inc.
2512 Barton Avenue
Nashville, TN 37212-4100 / US
[2018/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ALLY, Brandon
2512 Barton Avenue
Nashville, TN 37212 / US
02 / WYLIE, Scott
9117 Oden Court
Brentwood, TN 37027 / US
 [2018/15]
Representative(s)Clark, Jane Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2018/15]
Application number, filing date16804606.803.06.2016
[2018/15]
WO2016US35915
Priority number, dateUS201562171336P05.06.2015         Original published format: US 201562171336 P
[2018/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016197063
Date:08.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3302227
Date:11.04.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016
[2018/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.12.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61B3/028, A61B3/032, A61B5/16
[2018/49]
Former International [2018/15]A61B3/028, A61B3/032
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DER LEISTUNGSFÄHIGKEIT IM SCHNELLTEMPO VON MENSCHEN[2018/15]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUS TO MEASURE FAST-PACED PERFORMANCE OF PEOPLE[2018/15]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR MESURER LES PERFORMANCES SUITE À DES STIMULATIONS RAPIDES DE PERSONNES[2018/15]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2018National basic fee paid 
04.01.2018Search fee paid 
04.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/15]
04.01.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.10.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
06.01.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
06.01.2020Request for further processing filed
06.01.2020Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.01.2020Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XAI]WO0205247  (COGNIFIT LTD NAIOT [IL], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 8 - page 9 * * page 13, line 28 - page 14, line 1 * * page 16, line 5 - line 12 * [A] 7-12 [I] 5,6,13-15;
 [XAI]US2003073885  (THEODORACOPULOS ALEXIS [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0105] * [A] 7-12 [I] 4,5,13-15;
 [XAI]US2005273017  (GORDON EVIAN [AU]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0131] - paragraph [0134] * * paragraph [0153] - paragraph [0170] * [A] 7-12 [I] 3-6,13-15;
 [A]US2015126899  (GHAJAR JAMSHID [US], et al) [A] 4 * figures 4A, 4B * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0056] *;
 [A]US2007218440  (DELAHUNT PETER B [US], et al) [A] 13 * figures 7-8 *;
 [X]  - NintenDaan, "[eShop EU] Brain Training (DS VC) - First Look", Youtube, (20140616), page 1, URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=KtzB5cCuBu8, (20181012), XP054978777 [X] 1,2 * Minutes 8:00-13:00 *
 [A]  - MIRIAM SPERING ET AL, "Keep your eyes on the ball: smooth pursuit eye movements enhance prediction of visual motion", JOURNAL OF NEUROPHYSIOLOGY, US, (20110401), vol. 105, no. 4, doi:10.1152/jn.00344.2010, ISSN 0022-3077, pages 1756 - 1767, XP055515864 [A] 4,14 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/jn.00344.2010
 [A]  - Z. LIU, "Perceptual learning in motion discrimination that generalizes across motion directions", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (19991123), vol. 96, no. 24, doi:10.1073/pnas.96.24.14085, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 14085 - 14087, XP055515596 [A] 3,4 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.24.14085
 [A]  - WOUTER VAN DEN BOS, "Better than expected or as bad as you thought? The neurocognitive development of probabilistic feedback processing", FRONTIERS IN HUMAN NEUROSCIENCE, (20090101), vol. 3, doi:10.3389/neuro.09.052.2009, XP055517332 [A] 5 * "Probabilistic learning task" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/neuro.09.052.2009
 [I]  - RASA GULBINAITE ET AL, "Fronto-parietal network oscillations reveal relationship between working memory capacity and cognitive control", FRONTIERS IN HUMAN NEUROSCIENCE, (20140930), vol. 8, doi:10.3389/fnhum.2014.00761, XP055550788 [I] 1,2,7-14 * figures 2, 3 * * "Task", "Procedure" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fnhum.2014.00761
 [I]  - JESÚS CESPÓN ET AL, "Electrophysiological Correlates of Amnestic Mild Cognitive Impairment in a Simon Task", PLOS ONE, (20131205), vol. 8, no. 12, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0081506, page e81506, XP055550795 [I] 1,2,7-14 * figure 1; table 2 * * "Task" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0081506
 [A]  - ROBERT W. PROCTOR, "Playing the Simon game: Use of the Simon task for investigating human information processing", ACTA PSYCHOLOGICA, NL, (20110201), vol. 136, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.actpsy.2010.06.010, ISSN 0001-6918, pages 182 - 188, XP055550742 [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.actpsy.2010.06.010
International search[X]US2005187436  (DONIGER GLEN M [US], et al) [X] 1-19, 23-40 * entire document *;
 [A]US2012075586  (KIRSCHEN DAVID GARY [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * entire document *;
 [A]US2003109800  (POLAT URI [IL]) [A] 1-40 * entire document *;
 [A]US2012154745  (YOO HERB [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * entire document *