Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3383866 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3383866



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 368
05.02.2020 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
21.01.2020 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 2
07.08.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
07.08.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.08.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
12.09.2018 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
02.08.2018 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
31.07.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.07.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
31.07.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.06.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
27.06.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
20.06.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
16.05.2018 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
13.04.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
27.06.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 98
08.06.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
08.06.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 221
07.02.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
07.02.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
07.02.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4