Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3383866


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
06.02.2020 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
20.01.2020 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
09.08.2019 First examination report
03.08.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.02.2019 Change: Validation states published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
08.02.2019 Change - extension states published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
12.12.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.09.2018 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
07.09.2018 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
07.09.2018 Request for examination filed published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
15.08.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
14.08.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
25.07.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2018 Amendment by applicant
27.06.2018 Change - representative
27.06.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
15.06.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
16.12.2016 PCT data prior to European publication