Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3383866

EP3383866 - TETRAHYDROISOQUINOLINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.08.2019
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.09.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2020New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ViiV Healthcare UK Limited
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[2018/41]
Inventor(s)01 / JOHNS, Brian Alvin
Five Moore Drive
Research Triangle Park
NC 27709 / US
02 / VELTHUISEN, Emile Johann
Five Moore Drive
Research Triangle Park
NC 27709 / US
03 / WEATHERHEAD, Jason Gordon
Five Moore Drive
Research Triangle Park
NC 27709 / US
 [2018/41]
Representative(s)Gladwin, Amanda Rachel
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[2018/41]
Application number, filing date16806295.801.12.2016
[2018/41]
WO2016IB57270
Priority number, dateUS201562262934P04.12.2015         Original published format: US 201562262934 P
[2018/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017093938
Date:08.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3383866
Date:10.10.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2017
[2018/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07D405/14, C07D217/04, C07D217/06, C07D217/08, C07D217/24, C07D401/06, C07D405/04, C07D413/04, A61K31/472, A61P31/18
[2018/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/41]
TitleGerman:TETRAHYDROISOCHINOLINDERIVATE[2018/41]
English:TETRAHYDROISOQUINOLINE DERIVATIVES[2018/41]
French:DÉRIVÉS DE TÉTRAHYDROISOQUINOLINE[2018/41]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2018National basic fee paid 
27.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/41]
27.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.01.2020Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201904   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[IY]WO2014119636  (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]) [I] 1-18 * abstract * [Y] 1-13,16-18;
 [IPY]EP2952503  (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]) [IP] 1-18 * compounds of the examples, e.g. compound 7 on page 118, compound 33 on page 142, compound 4 on page 175, compound 82 on page 185, 5th compound on page 188; paragraphs [0001] , [0024] - [0026] - [0047] , [0172] , [0173]; claims 1,44-47; tables A-1 - A-9 * [Y] 1-13,16-18;
 [Y]WO2004096774  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-13,16-18 * example compounds; page 1, paragraph 1; claims 1,14-17 *;
 [X]  - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20150618), Database accession no. 1783707-94-7, XP002766551 [X] 1-4,7,10 * compound cas rn: 1783707-94-7 *
 [X]  - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20131223), Database accession no. 1501813-10-0, XP002766552 [X] 1-4,7,10 * compound cas rn: 1501813-10-0 *
 [X]  - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20131231), Database accession no. 1507478-99-0, XP002766553 [X] 1-4,7,10 * compound cas rn: 1507478-99-0 *
 [X]  - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20100530), Database accession no. 1226062-01-6, XP002766554 [X] 1-4 * compound cas rn: 1226062-01-6 *
 [X]  - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (20100530), Database accession no. 1226243-44-2, XP002766555 [X] 1-4 * compound cas rn: 1226243-44-2 *
 [X]  - Vasiliu, George; Greff, Cristea, "Synthesis of derivatives of 1,2,3,4-tetrahydronaphthalene-6-acetic acid with spasmolytic activity", CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1965), Database accession no. 1967:490565, XP002766556 [X] 1-4,16 * compounds cas rn's: 16241-93-3 and 16241-92-2 *
 [X]  - WILKINS REEVE ET AL, "Reaction of chloral with naphthalene, and the synthesis of [alpha]-methoxynaphthylacetic acids from naphthyl(trichloromethyl)carbinols", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, CA, (19680701), vol. 46, no. 13, doi:10.1139/v68-363, ISSN 0008-4042, pages 2233 - 2238, XP055340482 [X] 1-4,9 * page 2237, column 2, paragraphs 3,4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/v68-363
by applicant   - HAZEN ET AL., "In vitro antiviral activity of the novel, tyrosyl-based human immunodeficiency virus (HIV) type 1 protease inhibitor brecanavir (GW640385) in combination with other antiretrovirals and against a panel of protease inhibitor-resistant HIV", ANTIMICROB. AGENTS CHEMOTHER., (2007), vol. 51, pages 3147 - 3154
    - PAUWELS ET AL., "Sensitive and rapid assay on MT-4 cells for the detection of antiviral compounds against the AIDS virus", J. OF VIROLOGICAL METHODS, (1987), vol. 16, pages 171 - 185