Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3384045

EP3384045 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING CELL CLONALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.07.2019
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.09.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip07.01.2020New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ares Trading S.A.
Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz
1170 Aubonne / CH
[2018/41]
Inventor(s)01 / LA NEVE, Fabio
Corso Peschiera 258
10138 Torino / IT
02 / FEGER, Georg
108A Rue de Carouge
1205 Geneva / CH
03 / TOSO, Emiliano
Via Almasso 26
13888 Mongrando (BI) / IT
 [2018/41]
Representative(s)Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property
Terre Bonne Business Park
Building Z0
Route de Crassier 1
1262 Eysins / CH
[N/P]
Former [2018/41]Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property
Terre Bonne Business Park A2
Route de Crassier 15
1162 Eysins / CH
Application number, filing date16809319.301.12.2016
[2018/41]
WO2016EP79427
Priority number, dateEP2015019789403.12.2015         Original published format: EP 15197894
[2018/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017093400
Date:08.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3384045
Date:10.10.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2017
[2018/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2018/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/41]
Extension statesBA18.05.2018
ME18.05.2018
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON ZELLOBERFLÄCHEN-ANTIGENKLONALITÄT[2018/41]
English:METHOD FOR DETERMINING CELL CLONALITY[2018/41]
French:MÉTHODE DE DÉTERMINATION DE LA CLONALITÉ CELLULAIRE[2018/41]
Entry into regional phase18.05.2018National basic fee paid 
18.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/41]
18.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.12.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2012083069  (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2015038337  (LIU JUNJIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]KR20140096988  (MERCK SERONO SA [CH]) [A] 1-19;
 [A]US2013130311  (SHAPIRO EHUD Y [IL], et al) [A] 1-19
 [I]  - SUFFICOOL KARI E ET AL, T-cell clonality assessment by next-generation sequencing improves detection sensitivity in mycosis fungoides., JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF DERMATOLOGY AUG 2015, VOL. 73, NR. 2, PAGE(S) 228 - 36.E2, (201508), ISSN 1097-6787, XP002766636 [I] 1-19 * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaad.2015.04.030
 [A]  - BLECK G T, "An Alternative Method for the Rapid Generation of Stable, High-Expressing Mammalian Cell Lines", vol. 1, no. 7, (20050901), BioProcessing Journal, URL: http://www.gala.com/pdf/bioprocessingj.pdf, (20160902), XP002761142 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BOYD S D ET AL, "Measurement and clinical monitoring of human lymphocyte clonality by massively parallel V-D-J pyrosequencing", SCIENCE TRANSLATIONAL MEDICINE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, (20091223), vol. 1, no. 12, ISSN 1946-6234, pages 1 - 8, XP003031087 [A] 1-19 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/scitranslmed.3000540