Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3371984

EP3371984 - MULTI-GLAZED WINDOW INCORPORATING A NOISE REDUCTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.05.2019
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.08.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.05.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Technofirst
48, Avenue des Templiers
13400 Aubagne / FR
For all designated states
Carme, Christian
43, rue André Audoli
13010 Marseille / FR
[N/P]
Former [2018/37]For all designated states
Technofirst
48
Avenue des Templiers
13400 Aubagne / FR
For all designated states
Carme, Christian
43, rue André Audoli
13010 Marseille / FR
Inventor(s)01 / CARME, Christian
43
Rue André Audoli
13010 Marseille / FR
 [2018/37]
Representative(s)Roman, Alexis
Cabinet Roman
35 rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
[2018/37]
Application number, filing date16809476.102.11.2016
[2018/37]
WO2016FR52839
Priority number, dateFR2015006049102.11.2015         Original published format: FR 1560491
[2018/37]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017077236
Date:11.05.2017
Language:FR
[2017/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3371984
Date:12.09.2018
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2017
[2018/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04R7/04, E06B3/67, E06B5/20, G10K11/178, H04R7/18
[2018/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/37]
TitleGerman:MEHRFACHVERGLASTES FENSTER MIT EINER GERÄUSCHREDUZIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2018/37]
English:MULTI-GLAZED WINDOW INCORPORATING A NOISE REDUCTION DEVICE[2018/37]
French:FENETRE MULTI-VITRAGE INTEGRANT UN DISPOSITIF DE REDUCTION DU BRUIT[2018/37]
Entry into regional phase01.06.2018National basic fee paid 
01.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
01.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/37]
10.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[AD]FR2766650  (TECHNOFIRST [FR]) [AD] 1-11 * abstract * * figures 2,4-6 *
by applicantUS6285773