Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469254

EP3469254 - MEDICAL LIGHTING DEVICE WITH A POSITIONING AID SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2019/16]MEDICAL LIGHTING DEVICE WITH A SYSTEM FOR ASSISTING WITH CORRECT POSITIONING
[2019/47]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.11.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Maquet SAS
Parc de Limère
Avenue de la Pomme de Pin
45160 Ardon / FR
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / RAVALITERA, Pierre
C/O MAQUET SAS
Parc de Limère
Avenue de la Pomme de Pin
45160 Ardon / FR
02 / JEUDI, Thomas
C/O MAQUET SAS
Parc de Limère
Avenue de la Pomme de Pin
45160 Ardon / FR
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Prugneau, Philippe
Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub 3 avenue Doyen Louis Weil Le Grenat - EUROPOLE
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16809494.415.11.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016FR52952
Priority number, dateFR2016005523008.06.2016         Original published format: FR 1655230
[2019/16]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017212126
Date:14.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469254
Date:17.04.2019
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F21V14/02, F21V21/28, F21W131/205, F21Y115/10, F21Y115/30, F21V21/40
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:OPERATIONSLEUCHTE MIT EINEM POSITIONIERUNGSHILFSYSTEM[2019/47]
English:MEDICAL LIGHTING DEVICE WITH A POSITIONING AID SYSTEM[2019/47]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ECLAIRAGE MEDICAL AVEC UN SYSTEME D'AIDE AU BON POSITIONNEMENT[2019/16]
Former [2019/16]MEDIZINISCHE BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM HILFSSYSTEM ZUR KORREKTEN POSITIONIERUNG
Former [2019/16]MEDICAL LIGHTING DEVICE WITH A SYSTEM FOR ASSISTING WITH CORRECT POSITIONING
Entry into regional phase08.01.2019National basic fee paid 
08.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
08.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
08.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
02.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US2003014834  (NAUGHTON MICHAEL L [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2007110895  (SPADARO ANTONIO [IT]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5068767  (KOYAMA MITSUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4639838  (KATO YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2009318772  (MARKA RUDOLF [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *
by applicantEP2760257