Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3549075

EP3549075 - RAW MATERIAL AND/OR RECYCLING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2020Change: Validation statespublished on 04.03.2020 [2020/10]
31.01.2020Change - extension statespublished on 04.03.2020 [2020/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
innogy Innovation GmbH
Lysegang 11
45139 Essen / DE
[2019/41]
Inventor(s)01 / STÖCKER, Carsten
Verdistraße 5
40724 Hilden / DE
02 / LIMBOURG, Philipp
Rübezahlstraße 11a
45134 Essen / DE
03 / ROTHKEPPEL, Markus
Stocksiepen 3
45133 Essen / DE
 [2019/41]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[2019/41]
Application number, filing date16809674.130.11.2016
[2019/41]
WO2016EP79247
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018099549
Date:07.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3549075
Date:09.10.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2018
[2019/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/08, G06K19/00, G07F7/06, H05K1/00
[2019/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/41]
TitleGerman:ROHMATERIAL UND/ODER RECYCLINGSYSTEM[2019/41]
English:RAW MATERIAL AND/OR RECYCLING SYSTEM[2019/41]
French:SYSTÈME DE MATIÈRE PREMIÈRE ET/OU DE RECYCLAGE[2019/41]
Entry into regional phase09.05.2019National basic fee paid 
09.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/41]
09.05.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2006031824  (ADASA INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2009024479  (GONEN RON [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]EP0512543  (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1256910  (TRION AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1640896  (SWISSCOM MOBILE AG [CH]) [A] 1-15
 [I]  - Editors : Kazi ET AL, "LIFECYCLE MANAGEMENT OF FACILITIES COMPONENTS USING RADIO FREQUENCY IDENTIFICATION AND BUILDING INFORMATION MODEL", Journal of Information Technology in Construction (ITcon), (20090101), pages 238 - 262, URL: http://itcon.org/papers/2009_18.content.01307.pdf, XP055344739 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [I]  - PARLIKAD ET AL, "RFID-based product information in end-of-life decision making", CONTROL ENGINEERING PRACTICE, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (20070918), vol. 15, no. 11, doi:10.1016/J.CONENGPRAC.2006.08.008, ISSN 0967-0661, pages 1348 - 1363, XP022257983 [I] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.conengprac.2006.08.008