Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469493

EP3469493 - REDUCING LATENCY OF DIGITAL CONTENT DELIVERY OVER A NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
16.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 18.09.2019 [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DAVIES, Scott Tadashi
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View California 94043 / US
02 / LEWIS, Justin
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View California 94043 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Robinson, David Edward Ashdown
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester M1 4HD / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16810142.617.11.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016US62542
Priority number, dateUS20161518211814.06.2016         Original published format: US201615182118
[2019/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218034
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469493
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:REDUZIERUNG DER LATENZZEIT BEI DER BEREITSTELLUNG VON DIGITALEM INHALT ÜBER EIN NETZWERK[2019/16]
English:REDUCING LATENCY OF DIGITAL CONTENT DELIVERY OVER A NETWORK[2019/16]
French:RÉDUCTION DE LA LATENCE DE LA DISTRIBUTION DE CONTENU NUMÉRIQUE SUR UN RÉSEAU[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.04.2018Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
14.01.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US2013097029  (MHATRE AMIT [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,12 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0064] * [Y] 1-12 [I] 1-12;
 [Y]US2009106087  (KONAR ELLEN [US]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0035] *;
 [Y]US2015206199  (ZHANG PENG [US]) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0044] *;
 [Y]US2014089080  (TAJIMA AKIRA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0094] *;
 [A]US2011313843  (ROUNTHWAITE ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0044] *;
 [A]US2013124342  (VIRKAR AMEYA [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0051] *