Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3383814

EP3383814 - LASER WELDING TRANSPARENT GLASS PANES USING A LOW EMISSIVITY COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.01.2020
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.09.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  21.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2020New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
31.01.2020First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Corning Incorporated
1 Riverfront Plaza
Corning, New York 14831 / US
[2018/41]
Inventor(s)01 / STRELTSOV, Alexander Mikhailovich
10879 Hidden Meadow Trail
Corning New York 14830 / US
02 / THOMAS, John Christopher
77 Hendy Creek Road
Elmira New York 14905 / US
 [2018/41]
Representative(s)Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/41]Scheuermann, Erik
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date16810217.629.11.2016
[2018/41]
WO2016US63936
Priority number, dateUS201562260802P30.11.2015         Original published format: US 201562260802 P
[2018/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017095784
Date:08.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3383814
Date:10.10.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2017
[2018/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:C03C23/00, C03C17/36, C03C27/06, E06B3/66, E06B3/663, B29C65/16, C03C27/10
[2018/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/41]
TitleGerman:LASERSCHWEISSEN VON TRANSPARENTEN GLASSCHEIBEN MIT EINER BESCHICHTUNG MIT NIEDRIGEM EMISSIONSVERMÖGEN[2018/41]
English:LASER WELDING TRANSPARENT GLASS PANES USING A LOW EMISSIVITY COATING[2018/41]
French:SOUDAGE AU LASER DE VITRES TRANSPARENTES À L'AIDE D'UN REVÊTEMENT À FAIBLE ÉMISSIVITÉ[2018/41]
Entry into regional phase21.06.2018National basic fee paid 
21.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/41]
04.02.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2014186557  (GRZYBOWSKI RICHARD ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0029] - [0046] - [0097] - [0110] * * figures 1-4,12-17 * * pages 1-18 * [I] 11-22;
 [XI]WO2013008724  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * * in particular example 1 (paragraphs 62-70) * [I] 11-22