Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3308983

EP3308983 - STUD AND TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.07.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 21.08.2019  [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2018/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SAWADA Hiroki
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
02 / KAWAMATA Satoru
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2018/16]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[2019/34]
Former [2018/16]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date16811602.814.06.2016
[2018/16]
WO2016JP67607
Priority number, dateJP2015012042815.06.2015         Original published format: JP 2015120428
[2018/16]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016204128
Date:22.12.2016
Language:JA
[2016/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3308983
Date:18.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3308983
Date:21.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP22.12.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.06.2018
ClassificationInternational:B60C11/16
[2018/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SPIKE UND REIFEN[2018/16]
English:STUD AND TIRE[2018/16]
French:CLOU ET PNEU[2018/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2018Translation filed 
10.01.2018National basic fee paid 
10.01.2018Search fee paid 
10.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/16]
10.01.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2019Fee for grant paid
09.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.07.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004231775  (EROMAKI PENTTI JUHANI [FI]) [X] 1 * figure 7; claim - *;
 [X]WO2014027145  (SCASON OY [FI]) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [E]EP3287301  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [E] 1-3 * paragraphs [0021] - [0038] - [0042]; figures 2a,4; claim - *;
 [E]EP3222441  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [E] 1-3 * paragraph [0081]; figures 1A,5; claim - *;
 [X]RU2152318  (OAO NIZHNEKAMSKSHINA) [X] 1,3 * paragraphs [0002] , [0035]; figures 2,3,14 *
International search[XA]JP2014180952  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1, 3 * , claim 1; paragraphs [0020], [0021]; table 1; fig. 1, 3 & WO 2014/148262 A1 & EP 2977231 A1 claim 1; paragraphs [0024], [0025]; table 1; fig. 1, 3 * [A] 2;
 [A]JP2002120517  (CONTINENTAL AG) [A] 1-3 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2002/0050312 A1 & EP 1199193 A1 *;
 [A]CN101269613  (NOKIAN RENKAAT OYJ [FI]) [A] 1-3 * , entire text; all drawings & SE 530047 C & FI 20070938 A & SE 700689 A & EA 200702431 A & UA 95241 C & FI 20070938 AO *;
 [A]US2004231775  (EROMAKI PENTTI JUHANI [FI]) [A] 1-3 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2007/0056666 A1 & US 2008/0060733 A1 *;
 [A]JPS63242703  (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN) [A] 1-3 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *