Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3307183

EP3307183 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DAMAGING OR DESTROYING ADIPOCYTES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mattioli Engineering Corporation
1765 Greensboro Station Place
Suite 900
McLean, VA 22102 / US
[2018/16]
Inventor(s)01 / BERNABEI, Gian Franco
Via Vittorio Alfieri 10
50121 Firenze / IT
 [2018/16]
Representative(s)Savi, Massimiliano , et al
NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI S.p.A.
Corso di Porta Vittoria 9
20122 Milano / IT
[2018/16]
Application number, filing date16812127.527.05.2016
[2018/16]
WO2016US34511
Priority number, dateUS20151473904015.06.2015         Original published format: US201514739040
[2018/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016204957
Date:22.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3307183
Date:18.04.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2016
[2018/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.12.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61N7/00
[2019/05]
Former International [2018/16]A61B17/22
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/16]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHÄDIGUNG ODER ZERSTÖRUNG VON ADIPOZYTEN[2018/16]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DAMAGING OR DESTROYING ADIPOCYTES[2018/16]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ENDOMMAGER OU DÉTRUIRE DES ADIPOCYTES[2018/16]
Entry into regional phase12.01.2018National basic fee paid 
12.01.2018Search fee paid 
12.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
12.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/16]
12.01.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP2252369  (ALMA LASERS LTD [IL]) [Y] 1,3-6 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0033] , [0041] , [0042] , [0055] , [0061] , [0065] , [0066] , [0082] , [0097] - [0099] - [0118]; figures 1-25B * [A] 2;
 [Y]JPS63309249  (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO) [Y] 1,3-6 * abstract *;
 [A]EP2586395  (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0006] , [0010] - [0035]; figures 1A-D *
International search[Y]US8579835  (BRITVA ALEXANDER [IL], et al) [Y] 1-14 * ; column 16, lines 1-67 *;
 [Y]US2013260469  (DJORDJEVIC BORISLAV B [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0076] and [0090] - [0096] *;
 [Y]US8636665  (SLAYTON MICHAEL H [US], et al) [Y] 7 * ; column 11, line 64-column 12, line 18 *;
 [Y]US6368281  (SOLOMON RODNEY J [US], et al) [Y] 8 * ; column 2, lines 20-24; column 3, line 43 to column 4 line 9 *;
 [A]US8133191  (ROSENBERG AVNER [IL], et al) [A] 1-14 * ; entire document *;
 [A]US2006241531  (GRUBER WILLIAM H [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * ; entire document *;
 [A]US2002077550  (RABINER ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * ; entire document *
by applicantEP2252369
 JPS63309249
 EP2586395