Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3310903

EP3310903 - VASCULARIZED TISSUE, SKIN OR MUCOSA EQUIVALENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
National University of Singapore
21 Lower Kent Ridge Road
Singapore 119077 / SG
[2018/17]
Inventor(s)01 / CAO, Tong
c/o National University of Singapore
Faculty of Dentistry
Discipline of Oral Sciences
21 Lower Kent Ridge Road
Singapore 119077 / SG
02 / HANDRAL, Harish Kiran
c/o National University of Singapore
Faculty of Dentistry
Discipline of Oral Sciences
21 Lower Kent Ridge Road
Singapore 119077 / SG
03 / GOPU, Sriram
c/o Institute of Medical Biology
8A Biomedical Grove
06-06 Immunos
Singapore 138648 / SG
 [2018/17]
Representative(s)Myint, Julie Marie
Symbiosis IP Limited
Cardiff MediCentre
Heath Park
Cardiff CF14 4UJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/17]Fyles, Julie Marie
Symbiosis IP Limited
Basepoint Business Centre
Vale Business Park
Crab Apple Way, Evesham
Worcestershire WR11 1GP / GB
Application number, filing date16814822.921.06.2016
[2018/17]
WO2016SG50282
Priority number, dateGB2015001091322.06.2015         Original published format: GB 201510913
[2018/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016209166
Date:29.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3310903
Date:25.04.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2016
[2018/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU29.12.2016
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.01.2019
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/071, A61L27/38, A61L27/60
[2018/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/17]
TitleGerman:VASKULARISIERTES GEWEBE-, HAUT- ODER SCHLEIMHAUTÄQUIVALENT[2018/17]
English:VASCULARIZED TISSUE, SKIN OR MUCOSA EQUIVALENT[2018/17]
French:ÉQUIVALENT DE TISSU, DE PEAU OU DE MUQUEUSE VASCULARISÉ[2018/17]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2018National basic fee paid 
11.01.2018Search fee paid 
11.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/17]
11.01.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.07.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
07.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0358506  (MARROW TECH INC [US]) [X] 10-15 * Sections 7.1, 7.2 and 7.5 * [I] 1-9;
 [A]US2009169521  (LEVENBERG SHULAMIT [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-66, paragraphs 199-200 *
International search[XA]WO2004039248  (THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION) [X] 17 * Abstract; page 2, line 6; page 4, lines 11-19; page 5, lines 27-29; page 7, lines 17-22; page 13, lines 23-27; pages 44-45; claims 51-78 * [A] 1-16, 18-31
 [PX]WO2016015754  (UNIVERSITÄT ZÜRICH) [PX] 1-31 * Abstract; pages 2-11; claims 1-34 *
 [PX]WO2016039687  (NATIONAL UNIVERSITY OF SINGAPORE) [PX] 17-29 * Abstract; pages 9-10; pages 19-21; Examples 1, 2, 7, 10; claims 16-23, 29-32 *
 [XA]  - ITOH M. et al., "Generation of 3D Skin Equivalents Fully Reconstituted from Human Induced Pluripotent Stem Cells (iPSCs", PLOS One., (20130000), vol. 8, no. issue 10, page e77673, XP055340469 [X] 17-29 * . Figure 4, page 5; pages 6-7 * [A] 1-16, 30-31

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0077673
 [XA]  - GOPU S., "In-Vitro Vascularized Tissue Equivalents from Human Embryonic Stem Cell -Derived Endothelial and Vascular Smooth Muscle Cells", (20140000), URL: http://scholarbank.nus.edu.sg/handle/10635/53785, (20160916), XP055340472 [X] 17 * Chapters 5 and 6 * [A] 1-16, 18-31
 [A]  - SHAMIR E.R. et al., "Three-dimensional organotypic culture: experimental models of mammalian biology and disease", Nature Reviews, Molecular Cell Biology., (20140000), vol. 15, pages 647 - 664, XP055340473 [A] 0 * . *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrm3873
 [A]  - OH J.W. et al., "Organotypic Skin Culture", Journal of Investigative Dermatology., (20130000), vol. 133, no. 11, page e14, XP055340474 [A] 0 * . *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/jid.2013.387