Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3465247

EP3465247 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REMOVING GIBBS ARTIFACT IN MEDICAL IMAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  30.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
02.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shanghai United Imaging Healthcare Co., Ltd.
No.2258 Chengbei Rd.
Jiading District
Shanghai 201807 / CN
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Guobin
No.2258 Chengbei Road
Jiading Industrial District
Shanghai 201807 / CN
02 / LIU, Nan
No.2258 Chengbei Road
Jiading Industrial District
Shanghai 201807 / CN
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date16815528.131.05.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016CN84024
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017206048
Date:07.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/49]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3465247
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2017
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN07.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01R33/56
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON GIBBS-ARTEFAKTEN IN EINEM MEDIZINISCHEN BILDGEBUNGSSYSTEM[2019/15]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REMOVING GIBBS ARTIFACT IN MEDICAL IMAGING SYSTEM[2019/15]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLIMINATION D'ARTEFACTS GIBBS DANS UN SYSTÈME D'IMAGERIE MÉDICALE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase01.08.2017National basic fee paid 
01.08.2017Search fee paid 
01.08.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
01.08.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
30.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]CN104392473  (USTC UNIV SCIENCE TECH CN) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN104156994  (UNIV XIAMEN) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004113614  (LIANG ZHI-PEI [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN104013403  (UNIV ZHEJIANG SCIENCE & TECH) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN104714200  (UNIV NANCHANG) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - WANG, YA, "A New Method of MRI Image Reconstruction Based on All Phase FTT", China Dissertation Database, (20151203), pages 19 - 21, XP009507923 [Y] 1-8, 11, 15-17, 20
 [Y]  - YE, SI, "The Study of Truncation Artifacts Reduction in MR Image Based on Total Variation Denoising", China Dissertation Database, (20131231), pages 28 - 44, XP009507916 [Y] 1-8, 11, 15-17, 20