Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3384115

EP3384115 - ASSEMBLY FOR MOVING A DOOR OF A PIECE OF FURNITURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.10.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.09.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  03.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hettich-ONI GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestrasse 11-13
32606 Vlotho / DE
[2018/41]
Inventor(s)01 / CAPPELLOTTO, Leandro
Via San Quirino 11
33170 Pordenone / IT
 [2018/44]
Former [2018/41]01 / CAPPELLOTTO, Leandro
Via Sistiana 1
33170 Pordenone / IT
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/41]
Application number, filing date16815560.430.11.2016
[2018/41]
WO2016EP79230
Priority number, dateIT2015UB0602230.11.2015         Original published format: IT UB20156022
[2018/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017093290
Date:08.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3384115
Date:10.10.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2017
[2018/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:E05D15/40, E05D15/46, E05F1/14, E05F15/614, E05F15/63, E05D3/12
[2018/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/41]
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG ZUR BEWEGUNG EINER TÜR EINES MÖBELSTÜCKS[2018/41]
English:ASSEMBLY FOR MOVING A DOOR OF A PIECE OF FURNITURE[2018/41]
French:ENSEMBLE POUR DÉPLACER UNE PORTE D'UN MEUBLE[2018/41]
Entry into regional phase25.05.2018National basic fee paid 
25.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
25.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/41]
25.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XDAY]DE202010015091U  (GRASS GMBH [AT]) [XD] 1-3,10,12 * paragraphs [0044] , [0045] , [0055] , [0062] - [0067] * * figures 1-4 * [A] 4-9 [Y] 11;
 [XA]WO2007045631  (SALICE ARTURO SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-3,10,12 * page 4, line 33 - page 6, line 8 * * figures 1,4 * [A] 4-9,11;
 [YA]EP2248981  (HETTICH HETAL WERKE [DE]) [Y] 11 * paragraphs [0033] , [0036] , [0039] * * figures 2,3 * [A] 1-10,12;
 [A]US2002189052  (MELHUISH ROBERT A [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0011] , [0013] * * figures 1,2a,2b *
by applicantWO2012059173
 US2013333291