Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3391157

EP3391157 - FIELD BUS COUPLER, SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR CONFIGURING A FAILSAFE MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.09.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  03.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
[2018/43]
Inventor(s)01 / ROSE, Gorm
Sellinghusener Str. 13
33100 Paderborn / DE
 [2018/43]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2018/43]
Application number, filing date16815822.816.12.2016
[2018/43]
WO2016EP81339
Priority number, dateDE20151012206617.12.2015         Original published format: DE102015122066
[2018/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017103043
Date:22.06.2017
Language:DE
[2017/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3391157
Date:24.10.2018
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017
[2018/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/042
[2018/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/43]
TitleGerman:FELDBUSKOPPLER, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM KONFIGURIEREN EINES FEHLERSICHEREN MODULS[2018/43]
English:FIELD BUS COUPLER, SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR CONFIGURING A FAILSAFE MODULE[2018/43]
French:COUPLEUR DE BUS DE TERRAIN, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONFIGURATION D'UN MODULE PROTÉGÉ CONTRE LES ERREURS[2018/43]
Entry into regional phase28.06.2018National basic fee paid 
28.06.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
28.06.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/43]
28.06.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE102013106572  (WEIDMÜLLER INTERFACE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [Y]US2015127876  (ERNI KLAUS [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0130] - paragraph [0131]; figure 1A; claim 18 *
 [Y]US6891850  (VANDESTEEG KERRY W [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010]; figures 1,5,6,10 *