blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3380572

EP3380572 - PROVIDING OPAQUE INK JETTED IMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.04.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.03.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.02.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.08.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Formerunknown
Status updated on  04.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 17.08.2022  [2022/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Eastman Kodak Company
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
[2018/40]
Inventor(s)01 / BAUER, Charles, Leo
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
02 / JONES, Tamara, K.
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
03 / BENNETT, Grace, Ann
343 State Street
Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US
 [2018/40]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2018/40]
Application number, filing date16816459.810.11.2016
[2018/40]
WO2016US61211
Priority number, dateUS201562259234P24.11.2015         Original published format: US 201562259234 P
US201562259222P24.11.2015         Original published format: US 201562259222 P
US20161521813225.07.2016         Original published format: US201615218132
US20161521815625.07.2016         Original published format: US201615218156
[2018/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2017091356
Date:01.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3380572
Date:03.10.2018
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2018/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3380572
Date:13.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.06.2017
ClassificationIPC:C09D11/00, B41J2/01, B41J2/02, B41J2/185, B41M5/50, B41M5/52, C09D11/30, C09D11/32, C09D11/322, C09D11/326
[2018/40]
CPC:
C09D11/00 (EP); B41J2/01 (EP); B41J2/02 (EP);
B41J2/185 (EP); B41M5/502 (EP); B41M5/52 (EP);
C09D11/30 (EP); C09D11/32 (EP); C09D11/322 (EP);
C09D11/326 (EP); B41J2002/1853 (EP); B41M2205/40 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEREITSTELLUNG EINES TINTENSTRAHLGEDRUCKTEN OPAKEN BILDES[2020/17]
English:PROVIDING OPAQUE INK JETTED IMAGE[2018/40]
French:FOURNITURE D`IMAGE OPAQUE IMPRIMÉ PAR IMPRESSION DE JET ENCRE[2020/17]
Former [2018/40]BEREITSTELLUNG EINES OPAKEN TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKBILDES
Former [2018/40]FOURNITURE D'UNE IMAGE OPAQUE PAR INJECTION D'ENCRE
Entry into regional phase02.05.2018National basic fee paid 
02.05.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
02.05.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.05.2018Examination requested  [2018/40]
02.05.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.02.2020Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
20.02.2020Fee for grant paid
20.02.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.03.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.03.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)16.02.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.11.2016
AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CY13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
MK13.05.2020
MT13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SI13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
TR13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
IE10.11.2020
LU10.11.2020
BE30.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
[2022/33]
Former [2022/32]HU10.11.2016
AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CY13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
MK13.05.2020
MT13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SI13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
TR13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
IE10.11.2020
LU10.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
Former [2022/27]HU10.11.2016
AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CY13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
MT13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SI13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
TR13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
IE10.11.2020
LU10.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
Former [2021/46]AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SI13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
IE10.11.2020
LU10.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
Former [2021/37]AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SI13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
LU10.11.2020
CH30.11.2020
LI30.11.2020
Former [2021/33]AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SI13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
LU10.11.2020
Former [2021/31]AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
MC13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SI13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/24]AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SI13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/10]AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
PL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SK13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/09]AL13.05.2020
AT13.05.2020
CZ13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
EE13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
IT13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/08]AL13.05.2020
DK13.05.2020
ES13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
RO13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
SM13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/04]AL13.05.2020
FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
NL13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2021/01]FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
BG13.08.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/51]FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
RS13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/50]FI13.05.2020
HR13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
LV13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
GR14.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/48]FI13.05.2020
LT13.05.2020
SE13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
PT14.09.2020
Former [2020/47]LT13.05.2020
NO13.08.2020
IS13.09.2020
Former [2020/46]IS13.09.2020
Cited inInternational search[IY]WO2007105806  (RICOH KK [JP], et al) [I] 1,2 * page 62, line 23 - page 64, line 22; example 2; claims 1-6 * * page 42, lines 4,5 * * page 40, lines 14-19 * * page 28, lines 8-15 * * page 27, lines 8-10 * * page 13, lines 12-19 * * page 14, lines 6-12 *[Y] 3-15;
 [Y]US2014292951  (FERRAR WAYNE THOMAS [US], et al) [Y] 3-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0055] , [0064] , [0069] , [0071] , [0111] - [0116]; claims 1-9,27-30 *;
 [YA]US8991986  (SOWINSKI ALLAN FRANCIS [US], et al) [Y] 4,5 * column 12, lines 59-63; claims 1-7 * * claims 17-19 * [A] 1-3,6-15
by applicantUS5026427
 US5141556
 US5160370
 US5169436
 EP0597628
 US5473350
 US5526026
 US5605750
 US5723211
 US5789070
 US5891231
 US6045917
 US6079821
 US6505921
 US6517197
 US6554410
 US6575566
 US6588888
 US2003202054
 US6682182
 US6793328
 US6817705
 US6866370
 US7219989
 US2008207811
 US7592378
 US7850774
 US8187371
 US8430492
 US8455570
 US8562126
 US8697773
 US2014123874
 US2014288208
 US2014292902
    - "Glossary of Basic Terms in Polymer Science", Pure Appl. Chem, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PURE AND APPLIED CHEMISTRY (''IUPAC, (1996), vol. 68, pages 2287 - 2311
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.