Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3318236

EP3318236 - SHAPED NON-WOVEN FABRIC FOR ABSORBENT ARTICLE, ABSORBENT ARTICLE INCLUDING SAID SHAPED NON-WOVEN FABRIC, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAID SHAPED NON-WOVEN FABRIC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.05.2019
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.04.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Shimobun
Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime 799-0111 / JP
[2018/19]
Inventor(s)01 / HASHIMOTO, Tatsuya
c/o UNICHARM CORPORATION Technical Center
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
02 / OKUBO, Tetsuo
c/o UNICHARM CORPORATION Technical Center
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
03 / CHEN, Huanhuan
c/o UNICHARM CORPORATION Technical Center
1531-7 Wadahama
Toyohama-cho
Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP
 [2018/19]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/19]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date16817519.818.03.2016
[2018/19]
WO2016JP58857
Priority number, dateJP2015013212930.06.2015         Original published format: JP 2015132129
[2018/19]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017002409
Date:05.01.2017
Language:JA
[2017/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3318236
Date:09.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.01.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.09.2018
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/512, A61F13/15, A61F13/51, A61F13/511, A61F13/513
[2018/41]
Former International [2018/19]A61F13/512, A61F13/15, A61F13/51, A61F13/511
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/19]
TitleGerman:GEFORMTER VLIESSTOFF FÜR EINEN SAUGFÄHIGEN ARTIKEL, SAUGFÄHIGER ARTIKEL MIT DEM GEFORMTEN VLIESSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DIESES GEFORMTEN VLIESSTOFFS[2018/19]
English:SHAPED NON-WOVEN FABRIC FOR ABSORBENT ARTICLE, ABSORBENT ARTICLE INCLUDING SAID SHAPED NON-WOVEN FABRIC, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAID SHAPED NON-WOVEN FABRIC[2018/19]
French:NONTISSÉ FAÇONNÉ POUR ARTICLE ABSORBANT, ARTICLE ABSORBANT COMPRENANT LEDIT NONTISSÉ FAÇONNÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DUDIT NONTISSÉ FAÇONNÉ[2018/19]
Entry into regional phase21.12.2017Translation filed 
21.12.2017National basic fee paid 
21.12.2017Search fee paid 
21.12.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
21.12.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/19]
21.12.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[YA]JP2003116909  (KAO CORP) [Y] 1-2, 5-11 * , paragraphs [0020] to [0023], [0030] to [0036], [0042] to [0043]; fig. 4 (Family: none) * [A] 3-4;
 [Y]JPH0458951  (UNI CHARM CORP) [Y] 1-2, 5-11 * , page 2, lower right column, line 6 to page 3, upper right column, line 10; fig. 2 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2007216034  (KAO CORP) [Y] 7-11 * , paragraphs [0018] to [0023] (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2008025084  (UNI CHARM CORP) [Y] 10 * , paragraphs [0168] to [0169]; fig. 17 & EP 2034071 A1 paragraphs [0171] to [0172]; fig. 17 & WO 2007/148502 A1 & US 2007/0298213 A1 & KR 10-2009-0023342 A & TW 200804641 A & MY 148083 A *;
 [Y]JP2014519421  (The Procter & Gamble Co.) [Y] 11 * , paragraphs [0014] to [0015], [0020], [0023], [0054]; fig. 1 & WO 2012/148936 A1 page 5, line 15 to page 6, line 19; page 7, lines 21 to 31; page 8, line 22 to page 9, line 5; page 19, line 28 to page 20, line 9; fig. 1 & US 2012/0273997 A1 & EP 2701648 A & CA 2834590 A1 & CN 103491916 A & KR 10-20 *;
 [A]JPH01256955  (SHINKYOKUTO SANGYO KK) [A] 2-11 * , page 2, upper right column, lines 17 to 20; fig. 2 to 3 (Family: none) *;
 [A]WO2008146541  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP], et al) [A] 3-11 * , paragraphs [0022] to [0027]; fig. 1, 4 & EP 2153983 A1 paragraphs [0022] to [0027]; fig. 1, 4A to 4C & US 2010/0178456 A1 & WO 2008/146541 A1 & CN 101687383 A & MX 2009013015 A & AU 2008256028 A & EG 26152 A & BR PI0811353 A2 & KR 10-2010-0022490 A & CO 6251229 A & MA 31465 B & TW 200932525 A & MY *