Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3316823

EP3316823 - INTEGRATED HYBRID HEART VALVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.11.2019
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.04.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Edwards Lifesciences Corporation
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
[2018/19]
Inventor(s)01 / CONKLIN, Brian, S.
Edwards Lifesciences
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
02 / ZENG, Qinggang
Edwards Lifesciences
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
03 / HOWANEC, Myron, Jr.
Edwards Lifesciences
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
04 / KIM, Grace, M.
Edwards Lifesciences
One Edwards Way
Irvine, CA 92614 / US
 [2018/19]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
[2018/19]
Application number, filing date16818788.830.06.2016
[2018/19]
WO2016US40396
Priority number, dateUS201562188465P02.07.2015         Original published format: US 201562188465 P
[2018/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017004374
Date:05.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3316823
Date:09.05.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2017
[2018/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR05.01.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/24
[2019/11]
Former International [2018/19]A61F2/24, A61F2/82
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/19]
TitleGerman:INTEGRIERT HYBRIDE HERZKLAPPEN[2018/19]
English:INTEGRATED HYBRID HEART VALVES[2018/19]
French:VALVULES CARDIAQUES HYBRIDES INTÉGRÉES[2018/19]
Entry into regional phase02.02.2018National basic fee paid 
02.02.2018Search fee paid 
02.02.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
02.02.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/19]
02.02.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.08.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[I]US2010331972  (PINTOR RAFAEL [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * paragraphs [0109] - [0116]; figures 9A-9E * * paragraph [0123]; figure 12D *;
 [I]US2006195184  (LANE ERNEST [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * paragraphs [0167] - [0178]; figures 17A-19 *;
 [A]WO2012085913  (WAVE LTD V [IL], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0089] , [0090]; figure 9 *
International search[XY]US8696742  (PINTOR RAFAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 9 * See abstract; column 10, line 11 - column 16, line 45; claims 1-19; and figures 5A-16B. * [Y] 4;
 [Y]US2002143386  (DAVILA LUIS A [US], et al) [Y] 4 * See abstract; paragraph [0055]; claims 1-27; and figure 7. *;
 [X]WO2012047644  (EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES CORP [US], et al) [X] 1 * See abstract; paragraphs [0084]-[0135]; claims 1-30; and figures 5-26. *;
 [A]US2009192591  (RYAN TIMOTHY R [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 9 * See the whole document. *;
 [A]WO2013096854  (ABIOMED INC [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 9 * See the whole document. *
by applicantUS8641757
 US2010331972