Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3317614

EP3317614 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MULTI-MODE UNMANNED VEHICLE MISSION PLANNING AND CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.04.2018
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.05.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unmanned Innovations, Inc.
907 E. Strawbridge Avenue
Melbourne, Florida 32901 / US
[2018/19]
Inventor(s)01 / HANSON, Bruce
4280 Country Road
Melbourne, Florida 32934 / US
02 / HANSON, Thomas
93 Woodland Road
Ashland, Massachusetts 01721 / US
 [2018/19]
Representative(s)Gregorj S.r.l.
Via L. Muratori, 13/b
20135 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2018/19]Fiorentino, Luca , et al
Gregorj S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Via L. Muratori, 13 b
20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date16818823.330.06.2016
[2018/19]
WO2016US40492
Priority number, dateUS20151478823130.06.2015         Original published format: US201514788231
[2018/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017004419
Date:05.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3317614
Date:09.05.2018
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2017
[2018/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US05.01.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:B60F5/00, B63B1/04, G01C21/20, G05D1/00, B63B49/00, B63H9/06, B63B35/00, B63J3/00
[2019/20]
Former International [2018/19]G01C23/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/19]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR PLANUNG UND STEUERUNG VON MISSIONEN MULTIMODALER UNBEMANNTER FAHRZEUGE[2018/19]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MULTI-MODE UNMANNED VEHICLE MISSION PLANNING AND CONTROL[2018/19]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE PLANIFICATION ET DE COMMANDE DE MISSION DE VÉHICULE SANS PILOTE MULTIMODE[2018/19]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2017National basic fee paid 
20.12.2017Search fee paid 
20.12.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/19]
20.12.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US2007051292  (KILBOURN PAYNE [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US2012290164  (HANSON BRUCE [US], et al) [Y] 1-27 * , para [0011]-[0013], [0015]-[0016], [0021], [0042], [0046], [0052], [0062], [0067]-[0069], [0071]-[0073], Fig. 2, claim 1 2,3,4.5,25 *;
 [Y]US2005216182  (HUSSAIN TALIB S [US], et al) [Y] 1-27 * , para [0031], [0101]-[0105] *;
 [Y]US2005183569  (SOLOMON NEAL [US]) [Y] 6-7, 10-15, 22-27 * , para [0019]-[0020], [0030], [0068], [0164]-[0165], [0168], [0201]-[0202], [0211]-[0212], [0253]-[0256] *;
 [Y]US2009319112  (FREGENE KINGSLEY O C [US], et al) [Y] 16-17 * , para [0016], [0020] *;
 [Y]WO2014144001  (TERRAFUGIA INC [US]) [Y] 27 * , para [0015], [0044] *;
 [Y]US2010230532  (DIETRICH CARL CURTIS [US], et al) [Y] 27 * , [0074, [0081]] *