blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3332552 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3332552



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 395
20.02.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
12.02.2019 Closing of application Search / examination 1
04.02.2019 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
02.11.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
02.11.2018 Claim deemed abandoned Search / examination 2
14.06.2018 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
14.06.2018 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 21
07.06.2018 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 10
07.06.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
07.06.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
16.05.2018 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
09.04.2018 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
29.03.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42
13.03.2018 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
09.03.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.02.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
26.02.2018 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 15
26.02.2018 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
26.02.2018 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 8
26.02.2018 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
26.02.2018 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.11.2017 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 50
17.11.2017 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.11.2017 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 8
17.11.2017 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
07.11.2017 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
06.11.2017 Notification of the recording of a change PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
06.11.2017 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
03.11.2017 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) (without attachments) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
19.10.2017 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 10
19.10.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
19.10.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
12.10.2017 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.10.2017 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.10.2017 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.10.2017 Document concerning representation PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.10.2017 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
05.10.2017 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
05.10.2017 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
05.10.2017 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 9
02.10.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 4
02.10.2017 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 2
02.10.2017 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 2
04.07.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
15.06.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
15.06.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 41
08.03.2017 ISR: cited documents (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
07.03.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
07.03.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
07.03.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 5
13.01.2017 Notification of receipt of Search copy (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
19.12.2016 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
19.12.2016 Annex International Searching Authority 3
19.12.2016 Claims International Searching Authority 6
19.12.2016 Description International Searching Authority 26
19.12.2016 Drawings International Searching Authority 8
19.12.2016 Fee calculation sheet for an international application International Searching Authority 2
19.12.2016 Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 2
19.12.2016 Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
19.12.2016 Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 4